Wiggins et al v. Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Plaintiff: Beverly Wiggins, Edward F Wiggins and Edward F. Wiggins
Defendant: Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Petitioner: United Wisconsin Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00746
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue or Transfer MOTION to Change Venue filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc.. (Smith, William)
November 5, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Action Bases on Improper Venue MOTION to Change Venue filed by Beverly Wiggins, Edward F. Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Haynes, Randall) Modified on 11/5/2020 to clarify the docket text (bes, ).
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United Wisconsin Insurance Company, Inc. re #8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Quinlivan, Lawrence) Modified on 11/2/2020 to add the link to the #8 notice (wcl, ).
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Now pending before the Court are the Defendant's motion to dismiss for improper venue or, in the alternative, transfer venue (doc. #7 ) and Movant's motion to intervene (doc. #6 ) both filed on October 22, 2020. Upon consideration of the motions, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that on or before November 6, 2020, the Plaintiffs shall show cause why the motions should not be granted. It is further ORDERED that the Defendant and the Movant may file a reply to the Plaintiff's response on or before November 13, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 10/23/2020. (kh, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Darden Restaurants, Inc #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Smith, William) Modified on 10/26/2020 to add the link to the #9 notice (wcl, ).
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant Darden Restaurants, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Movant United Wisconsin Insurance Company, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
October 21, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 MOTION - Attorney Chelsey Mitchell Edgerly for Defendant Darden Restaurants, Inc. added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Venue by Darden Restaurants, Inc.. (Smith, William). Added MOTION to Transfer Venue on 10/22/2020 (amf, ).
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Intervene by United Wisconsin Insurance Company, Inc.. (Quinlivan, Lawrence)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (wcl, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Darden Restaurants, Inc.; mailed by CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint & #2 Conflict Disclosure Statement. (amf, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Beverly Wiggins, Edward F. Wiggins. (wcl, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Beverly Wiggins, Edward F. Wiggins. (wcl, )
September 15, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Beverly Wiggins, Edward F. Wiggins. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Darden Restaurants, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602059459.), filed by Edward F. Wiggins, Beverly Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiggins et al v. Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Wiggins
Represented By: Randall Stark Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward F Wiggins
Represented By: Randall Stark Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward F. Wiggins
Represented By: Randall Stark Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Chelsey Mitchell Edgerly
Represented By: William F Smith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United Wisconsin Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Matthew Quinlivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?