Denny v. Calloway (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Timothy Scott Denny
Defendant: Rolanda Calloway and Steven T. Marshall
Case Number: 3:2020cv00972
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Opelika Office
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINAL JUDGMENT: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that judgment is entered in favor of Respondents and against Petitioner, and this action is DISMISSED under 28 USC 2244(b)(3); DIRECTING the Clerk to enter this document on the docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 1/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(amf, )
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) The Magistrate Judge's #2 Recommendation is ADOPTED; and 2) This case is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction, in accordance with the provisions of 28 USC 2244(b)(3)(A), because Petitioner has not obtained the required permission from the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals authorizing a federal district court to consider Petitioner's successive habeas application; A final judgment will be entered separately. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 1/6/2021. (amf, )
January 5, 2021 NO OBJECTIONS filed to the #2 Recommendation. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that Denny's operative 28 U.S.C. 2254 petition be DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction, as Denny has failed to obtain the requisite order from the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals authorizing a federal district court to consider his successive habeas application; Objections to R&R due by 12/23/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/9/2020. (am, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Timothy Scott Denny. (No IFP/No Filing Fee)(imm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denny v. Calloway (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolanda Calloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Scott Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?