Triplett v. Fidelity National Collections
Plaintiff: Lena Triplett
Defendant: Fidelity National Collections and Fidelity Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01035
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 Alias Summons issued as to Fidelity National Collections; mailed by CMRRR with #1 Complaint. (amf, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Philipps on behalf of Lena Triplett (Philipps, Mary) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/23/2020 to attach a properly published PDF document) (amf, ). Modified on 12/23/2020 (amf, ).
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David Joseph Philipps on behalf of Lena Triplett (Philipps, David) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/23/2020 to attach a properly published PDF document) (amf, ). Modified on 12/23/2020 (amf, ).
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting the #3 and #4 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorneys David J. Phillips and Mary E. Phillips are admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plf in this matter; Counsel should file a notice of appearance with the Court. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 12/22/2020. (bes, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Fidelity National Collections; mailed CMRRR with a copy of the #1 Complaint, #2 Disclosure Statement, and #3 & #4 PHV motions. (bes, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Lena Triplett. (djy, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602060593.) by Lena Triplett. (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for David J. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602060593.) by Lena Triplett. (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing, #2 fee)(djy, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lena Triplett. (Attachments: #1 conflict statement sign by atty Botes)(djy, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fidelity National Collections ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602060627.), filed by Lena Triplett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2020: #4 Exhibit B) (bes, ). Modified on 12/21/2020 to attach Exhibit that was previously not included during docketing (bes, ).
December 14, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lena Triplett. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triplett v. Fidelity National Collections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Collections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena Triplett
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Represented By: Bradford Wayne Botes
Represented By: David Joseph Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?