Harman v. Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher David Harman
Defendant: Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc. and Taurus Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00098
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before 4/23/2021, Plf shall show cause, if any there be, why the Motion for More Definite Statement (Doc. #20 ) should not be granted. Defs may file a reply on or before 5/7/2021, as further set out in order. Any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 4/23/2021, as further set out in order. Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 4/2/2021. (cwl, )
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for More Definite Statement and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Taurus Holdings, Inc., Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc.. (Carpenter, Reid)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of the #15 & #16 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, it is ORDERED that the Motions are GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 3/18/2021. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Pro Hac Vice filing fee received re #16 Motion: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602062638. (amf, )
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Pro Hac Vice filing fee received re #15 Motion: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602062637. (amf, )
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John F. Weeks by Taurus Holdings, Inc., Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc.. (Sewell, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/10/2021 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to the E-government rules: #1 Main Document (Redacted)) (amf, ). Modified on 3/10/2021 (amf, ).
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin E. Reed by Taurus Holdings, Inc., Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc.. (Sewell, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/10/2021 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to the E-government rules: #1 Main Document (Redacted)) (amf, ). Modified on 3/10/2021 (amf, ).
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency re: Pro Hac Vice Admission of John F. Weeks, IV. (amf, )
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency re: Pro Hac Vice Admission of Benjamin E. Reed. (amf, )
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' #8 unopposed motion to answer, and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 3/31/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 2/24/2021. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendants Taurus Holdings, Inc. & Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc.. (amf, )
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc.. (Sewell, Robert)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Taurus Holdings, Inc.. (Sewell, Robert)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Unopposed Special Appearance and Limited MOTION for Extension to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Taurus Holdings, Inc., Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc.. (Sewell, Robert)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ***PURSUANT TO THE #8 MOTION - Attorneys Reid Clark Carpenter, John F. Weeks, IV, & Benjamin E. Reed for Defendants Taurus Holdings, Inc. & Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc. added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by C. Justice for Taurus Holdings, Inc., served on 2/8/2021 (per USPS website), answer due 3/1/2021. (amf, )
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by C. Justice for Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc., served on 2/8/2021 (per USPS website), answer due 3/1/2021. (amf, )
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Christopher David Harman re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement . (Garmon, Matthew) Modified on 2/11/2021 to add the link to the #3 Notice (amf, ).
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Taurus Holdings, Inc., Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc. and mailed CMRRR w/ #1 Complaint. (am, )
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plaintiff Christopher David Harman; Corporate Disclosures due by 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Christopher David Harman. (amf, )
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Taurus Holdings, Inc., Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 4602061088), filed by Christopher David Harman. (Attachments: #1 Request for Service by Certified Mail, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Christopher David Harman. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF)(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harman v. Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: John F Weeks, IV
Represented By: Benjamin E. Reed
Represented By: Robert Jackson Sewell
Represented By: Reid Clark Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taurus Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: John F Weeks, IV
Represented By: Benjamin E. Reed
Represented By: Robert Jackson Sewell
Represented By: Reid Clark Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher David Harman
Represented By: David L Selby, II
Represented By: Michael Todd Wheeles
Represented By: Matthew Jason Ford
Represented By: Matthew Gregory Garmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?