Kroll v. Elevate Recoveries, LLC
Plaintiff: Wesley Kroll
Defendant: Elevate Recoveries, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00132
Filed: February 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the Court that Plaintiff's claims against the defendant is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Plaintiff's #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice; DIRECTING the Clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(amf, )
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the telephone conference call set for 4/13/2021 is CANCELLED. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/12/2021. (Furnished: Calendar & KR) (Terminated: Telephone Conference for 4/13/2021) (amf, )
April 12, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Wesley Kroll (Philipps, David)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Notice of Settlement; it is ORDERED that this matter is set for a telephone conference call on 4/13/2021 at 2:45 p.m.; The Courtroom Deputy shall provide the dial in information to the parties to participate in the telephone conference call. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/7/2021. (Furnished: Calendar & KR) (Mailed by regular mail & by CMRRR to Defendant) (amf, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by Wesley Kroll (Philipps, David)
March 29, 2021 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Elevate Recoveries, LLC; Copies furnished to all parties. (amf, )
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default by Wesley Kroll against Elevate Recoveries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group A, #2 Declkaration of Counsel in Support of Default Entry)(Philipps, David)
March 17, 2021 Copy of #11 Application & case file delivered to Clerk. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, #2 & #3 Disclosures, & #4 & #5 Motions signed by Kelly Webster for Elevate Recoveries, LLC served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (am, )
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 2/19/2021. (amf, )
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for David J. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 2/19/2021.(amf, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Elevate Recoveries, LLC; mailed by CMRRR with #1 Complaint, #2 Conflict Disclosure Statement, #3 Conflict Disclosure Statement, #4 Motion, & #5 Motion. (amf, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Wesley Kroll. (amf, )
February 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 75.00, receipt number 4602061517) by Wesley Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Receipt)(amf, )
February 15, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for David J. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 75.00, receipt number 4602061514) by Wesley Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Receipt)(amf, )
February 15, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wesley Kroll. (amf, )
February 15, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wesley Kroll. (amf, )
February 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elevate Recoveries, LLC (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 4602061500), filed by Wesley Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )
February 15, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wesley Kroll. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kroll v. Elevate Recoveries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elevate Recoveries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Kroll
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Represented By: Bradford Wayne Botes
Represented By: David Joseph Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?