Clark v. Carvana et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Umar Clark
Defendant: Carvana and Bridgecrest
Case Number: 3:2021cv00187
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plaintiff Umar Clark; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; The Clerk is directed to STAY service of process so the Court may conduct its obligatory review of the Complaint pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e). Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 3/12/2021. (wcl, )
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to the United States Magistrate Judge for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 3/10/2021. (wcl, )
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Umar Clark; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample)(am, )
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION (Application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Umar Clark. (am, )
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bridgecrest, Carvana, filed by Umar Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Carvana et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Umar Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carvana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgecrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?