Stevens v. Edwards et al
Plaintiff: Mary Carol Boman Stevens
Defendant: William Joseph Edwards, Moore & Balliew Oil Company, Inc. and Alfa Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00495
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by James Douglas McElvy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McElvy, James)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Request for Award of Attorneys' Fees filed by Mary Carol Boman Stevens. (Strickland, Michael)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Request for Award of Attorneys' Fees filed by William Joseph Edwards, Moore & Balliew Oil Company, Inc.. (Tuley, Jay)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE by Alfa Mutual Insurance Company NOTICE OF ELECTION TO OPT OUT OF PROCEEDINGS BY ALFA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Clark, Justin)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the defendants as to why #14 Motion to Remand to State Court should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 9/3/2021; further ORDERING that the plf may file a reply to the defs' response on or before 9/10/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/20/2021. (djy, )
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Clark, Justin)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mary Carol Boman Stevens re #13 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Strickland, Michael)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court and MOTION (Request) for Award of Attorneys' Fees by Mary Carol Boman Stevens. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A)(Strickland, Michael). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 9/13/2021 (am, ).
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Mary Carol Boman Stevens; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Alfa Mutual Insurance Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Alfa Mutual Insurance Company. (Clark, Justin)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Christopher Davidson on behalf of Alfa Mutual Insurance Company (Davidson, Patrick)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Gregory Clark on behalf of Alfa Mutual Insurance Company (Clark, Justin)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks. Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing that any parties wishing to provide consent to the Magistrate Judge must complete the form and submit to the clerk by 8/18/2021, as further set out in order; alternatively, the parties have the right to request reassignment of this case to a United States District Judge and should submit the reassignment form by mail by 8/18/2021, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/28/2021. (djy, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing that the parties shall file their Rule 26(f) report as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/18/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/28/2021. (djy, )
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (all parties) Alfa Mutual Insurance Company, William Joseph Edwards, Moore & Balliew Oil Company, Inc., Mary Carol Boman Stevens. (djy, )
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Moore & Balliew Oil Company, Inc. (djy, )
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by William Joseph Edwards. (djy, )
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by William Joseph Edwards, Moore & Balliew Oil Company, Inc. from Circuit Court of Macon County, AL, case number 46-CV-2021-9000065.00. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064052) (Attachments: #1 state court complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 to removal, #3 Exhibit 2 to removal, #4 Exhibit 3 to removal, #5 Answer defs Edwards and Moore Balliew Oil, #6 Answer Alfa Mutual Ins, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 fee receipt)(djy, )
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order COMPLAINT against Alfa Mutual Insurance Company, William Joseph Edwards, Moore & Balliew Oil Company, Inc., filed by Mary Carol Boman Stevens. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ).(djy, )
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mary Carol Boman Stevens. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ANSWER to Complaint by William Joseph Edwards, Moore & Balliew Oil Company, Inc. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ).(djy, )
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ANSWER to Complaint by Alfa Mutual Insurance Company. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ).(djy, )
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE to state court by William Joseph Edwards, Moore & Balliew Oil Company, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Carol Boman Stevens
Represented By: Michael Glen Strickland
Represented By: James Douglas McElvy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Joseph Edwards
Represented By: Jay Stewart Tuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore & Balliew Oil Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jay Stewart Tuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Davidson
Represented By: Justin Gregory Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?