Prosser et al v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Prosser, Brooke Prosser, Fred Rush, Nicholas Rush, Alex Rush, Gordon Weidle, Brandon Weidle, Michael Culjak, William Culjak, Caroline Culjak, Nicholas Perso and Nicholas Pero
Defendant: B. T. Roberts, Clark Sahlie, James W. Rane, Bob Dumas, Jimmy Sanford, Gaines Lanier, Elizabeth Huntley, Sarah B. Newton, Michael A. Demaioribus, James Partt, Wayne T. Smith, Raymond J. Harbert, Wayne T. McCray, Quentin Riggins, Timothy Vines, Kay Ivey, Jay Gogue, Bill Hargrave, Sarah Nobles, Karen Battye, Susan Marsh, James Pratt, Charles D. McCrary and Dr. Jay Gogue
Case Number: 3:2021cv00518
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #17 ), and for good cause, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendants may answer or file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' complaint on or before October 22, 2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/31/2021. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
August 24, 2021 Filing 40 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wayne T. Smith. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 40 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 39 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Kay Ivey. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 39 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 38 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Susan Marsh. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 38 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 37 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Karen Battye. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 37 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 36 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sarah Nobles. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 36 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 35 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jay Gogue. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 35 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 34 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bill Hargrave. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 34 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 33 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Timothy Vines. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 33 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 32 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Quentin Riggins. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 32 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 31 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Charles D. McCrary. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 31 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 30 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Raymond J. Harbert. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 30 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 29 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by James Pratt. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 29 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 28 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Michael A. Demaioribus. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 28 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 27 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sarah B. Newton. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 27 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 26 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Elizabeth Huntley. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 26 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 25 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Gaines Lanier. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 25 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 24 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jimmy Sanford. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 24 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 23 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bob Dumas. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 23 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by James W. Rane. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 22 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 21 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Clark Sahlie. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 21 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 20 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by B. T. Roberts. (Dowd, Augusta) (Main Document 20 replaced on 8/25/2021 to convert unprotected PDF into locked down PDF) (cwl, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DEFS) Karen Battye, Michael A. Demaioribus, Bob Dumas, Jay Gogue, Raymond J. Harbert, Bill Hargrave, Elizabeth Huntley, Kay Ivey, Gaines Lanier, Susan Marsh, Charles D. McCrary, Sarah B. Newton, Sarah Nobles, James Pratt, James W. Rane, Quentin Riggins, B. T. Roberts, Clark Sahlie, Jimmy Sanford, Wayne T. Smith, Timothy Vines. (cwl, )
August 24, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Correction re #17 Limited Notice of Appearance, to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the style of the case. (Attachments: #1 Correct Main doc entry #17 )(cwl, )
August 23, 2021 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Karen Battye, Michael A. Demaioribus, Bob Dumas, Jay Gogue, Raymond J. Harbert, Bill Hargrave, Elizabeth Huntley, Kay Ivey, Gaines Lanier, Susan Marsh, Charles D. McCrary, Sarah B. Newton, Sarah Nobles, James Pratt, James W. Rane, Quentin Riggins, B. T. Roberts, Clark Sahlie, Jimmy Sanford, Wayne T. Smith, Timothy Vines. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #17 for pdf) (cwl, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 17 Limited NOTICE of Appearance by Augusta Salem Dowd on behalf of All Defendants (Dowd, Augusta) Modified on 8/24/2021 to clarify text (cwl, ). (Main Document 17 replaced on 8/24/2021 to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the style of the case) (cwl, ).
August 10, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Nicholas Pero re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (amf, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Caroline Culjak re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (amf, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by William Culjak re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (amf, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Michael Culjak re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (amf, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Brandon Weidle re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (amf, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Gordon Weidle re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (amf, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Alex Rush re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (amf, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Nicholas Rush re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (amf, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Fred Rush re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (amf, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Brooke Prosser re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (amf, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jeffrey S. Prosser re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (amf, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; B. T. Roberts, Clark Sahlie, James W. Rane, Bob Dumas, Jimmy Sanford, Gaines Lanier, Elizabeth Huntley, Sarah B. Newton, Michael A. Demaioribus, James Pratt, Raymond J. Harbert, Wayne T. Smith, Charles D. McCrary, Quentin Riggins, Timothy Vines, Kay Ivey, Jay Gogue, Bill Hargrave, Sarah Nobles, Karen Battye, & Susan Marsh served on 8/5/2021 (per the paralegal to Plaintiff's counsel), answers due 8/26/2021. (amf, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plaintiffs Jeffrey S. Prosser, Brooke Prosser, Fred Rush, Nicholas Rush, Alex Rush, Gordon Weidle, Brandon Weidle, Michael Culjak, William Culjak, Caroline Culjak, & Nicholas Pero; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiffs Jeffrey S. Prosser, Brooke Prosser, Fred Rush, Nicholas Rush, Alex Rush, Gordon Weidle, Brandon Weidle, Michael Culjak, William Culjak, Caroline Culjak, & Nicholas Pero. (amf, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to B. T. Roberts, Clark Sahlie, James W. Rane, Bob Dumas, Jimmy Sanford, Gaines Lanier, Elizabeth Huntley, Sarah B. Newton, Michael A. Demaioribus, James Pratt, Raymond J. Harbert, Wayne T. Smith, Charles D. McCrary, Quentin Riggins, Timothy Vines, Kay Ivey, Jay Gogue, Bill Hargrave, Sarah Nobles, Karen Battye, & Susan Marsh; Returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (amf, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Karen Battye, Michael A. Demaioribus, Bob Dumas, Jay Gogue, Raymond J. Harbert, Bill Hargrave, Elizabeth Huntley, Kay Ivey, Gaines Lanier, Susan Marsh, Charles D. McCrary, Sarah B. Newton, Sarah Nobles, James Pratt, James W. Rane, Quentin Riggins, B. T. Roberts, Clark Sahlie, Jimmy Sanford, Wayne T. Smith, Timothy Vines (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 4602064191), filed by Fred Rush, Jeffrey S. Prosser, Gordon Weidle, William Culjak, Caroline Culjak, Nicholas Rush, Nicholas Pero, Michael Culjak, Alex Rush, Brooke Prosser, Brandon Weidle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prosser et al v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Prosser
Represented By: Mark Elliott Tippins
Represented By: Neil Everett Senkbeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Prosser
Represented By: Mark Elliott Tippins
Represented By: Neil Everett Senkbeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Rush
Represented By: Mark Elliott Tippins
Represented By: Neil Everett Senkbeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Rush
Represented By: Mark Elliott Tippins
Represented By: Neil Everett Senkbeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Rush
Represented By: Mark Elliott Tippins
Represented By: Neil Everett Senkbeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Weidle
Represented By: Mark Elliott Tippins
Represented By: Neil Everett Senkbeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Weidle
Represented By: Mark Elliott Tippins
Represented By: Neil Everett Senkbeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Culjak
Represented By: Mark Elliott Tippins
Represented By: Neil Everett Senkbeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Culjak
Represented By: Mark Elliott Tippins
Represented By: Neil Everett Senkbeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Culjak
Represented By: Mark Elliott Tippins
Represented By: Neil Everett Senkbeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Perso
Represented By: Mark Elliott Tippins
Represented By: Neil Everett Senkbeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Pero
Represented By: Mark Elliott Tippins
Represented By: Neil Everett Senkbeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. T. Roberts
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Sahlie
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Rane
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Dumas
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Sanford
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaines Lanier
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Huntley
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah B. Newton
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Demaioribus
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Partt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne T. Smith
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond J. Harbert
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne T. McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quentin Riggins
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Vines
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Gogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Hargrave
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Nobles
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Battye
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Marsh
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Pratt
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. McCrary
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jay Gogue
Represented By: Augusta Salem Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?