Collier v. McFarland et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Jamie Lee Collier
Defendant: John McFarland and Nurse Kim
Case Number: 3:2021cv00634
Filed: September 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON MOTION: it is ORDERED that the #10 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED and that the deadline for Def Johnson to file her Answer and Written Report is extended to 1/15/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/3/2021. (cwl, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer by Nurse Kim. (Lyckman, Haley)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Nurse Kim. (Lyckman, Haley)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley Elizabeth Lyckman on behalf of Nurse Kim (Lyckman, Haley)
November 3, 2021 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Nurse Kim. (NO pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint, #3 Amendment & #5 Order signed by R. T. for Nurse Kim served on 10/6/2021, answer due 11/15/2021. (cwl, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint, #3 Amendment & #5 Order signed by Rodney Tabb for John McFarland served on 10/6/2021, answer due 11/15/2021. (cwl, )
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION: it is ORDERED that the Motion to Amend (Doc. #3 ) is GRANTED. ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER by 11/15/2021; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with complaint and amendment to the Complaint (Doc. #3 ) via certified mail on the individuals named as defs. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/4/2021. (cwl, )
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON MOTION: granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk @ LEE COUNTY DETENTION CENTER. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/4/2021. (furn: cashier) (cwl, )
September 23, 2021 AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT against Nurse Kim, filed by Jamie Lee Collier. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #3 for pdf)(cwl, )
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint by Jamie Lee Collier. (hrs, )
September 23, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jamie Lee Collier. (Attachments: #1 Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(hrs, )
September 23, 2021 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against John McFarland, filed by Jamie Lee Collier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(hrs, )
September 23, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jamie Lee Collier.(No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ). (hrs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collier v. McFarland et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Lee Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Kim
Represented By: Haley Elizabeth Lyckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?