Brabble v. The Anthem Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Brabble
Defendant: The Anthem Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00658
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of the Dft's #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time which indicates that the plf does not oppose the fourteen (14) day extension, and for good cause, the motion is GRANTED; On or before 1/10/2022, the parties shall file the Rule 26(f) Report as requested in the Courts Order (Doc. No. #14 ). Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 12/2/2021. (es, )
December 2, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Deadline by The Anthem Life Insurance Company. (Allan, Aria) Modified on 12/2/2021 to clarify docket text as to pleading(es, ).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/27/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 11/29/2021. (amf, )
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties should now make their selection in writing to consent or request reassignment; DIRECTING the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 12/20/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 11/29/2021. (amf, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Anthem Life Insurance Company.(Allan, Aria)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of the defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time (Doc. No. #6 ), and for good cause, it is ORDERED that the motion (Doc. No. #6 ) is GRANTED. The defendant shall file an answer or other response to the plaintiff's complaint (Doc. No. #1 ) on or before November 18, 2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 10/27/2021. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as presiding Judge. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case. (cwl, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as presiding Judge. Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate no longer assigned to the case. (cwl, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DEF) The Anthem Life Insurance Company. (cwl, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The Anthem Life Insurance Company. (Allan, Aria)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The Anthem Life Insurance Company. (Allan, Aria)
October 26, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #6 MOTION - Attorney Cavender Crosby Kimble for The Anthem Life Insurance Company added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Summons signed by Jennifer Lockwood for The Anthem Life Insurance Company served on 10/7/2021, answer due 10/28/2021. (cwl, )
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Anthem Life Insurance Company; mailed CMRRR with a copy of the #1 Complaint. (bes, )
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Jeffrey Brabble. (cwl, )
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jeffrey Brabble. (cwl, ) Modified on 10/6/2021 to correct filed date (cwl, ).
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Anthem Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064853.), filed by Jeffrey Brabble. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(cwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brabble v. The Anthem Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Brabble
Represented By: David Paul Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Anthem Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Aria Bianca Allan
Represented By: Cavender Crosby Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?