Vaughn v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hurtis Vaughn
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc. and Vernon Harthorne Clark, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00781
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Grimes, Charles)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the parties shall file their Rule 26(f) report as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/14/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 12/17/2021. (amf, )
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: It is ORDERED that any party wishing to provide such consent must complete the form and submit it to the Clerk by 1/14/2022, as further set out in order; Any party wishing to submit the reassignment form must mail it to the above address by 1/14/2022, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 12/17/2021. (amf, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 10 Conflict Disclosure Statement re: #9 Notice of Deficiency by Vernon Harthorne Clark, Jr. (Grimes, Charles) Modified on 12/14/2021 to add linkage & clarify text as reflected in pleading (am, ).
December 14, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Vernon Harthorne Clark, Jr.; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample)(am, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Vernon Harthorne Clark, Jr. (am, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Vernon Harthorne Clark, Jr.(Grimes, Charles)
December 14, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 ANSWER - Attorney Morris Wade Richardson for Vernon Harthorne Clark, Jr added. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hurtis Vaughn. (Luck, Aaron)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by CSX Transportation, Inc. re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Richardson, Morris)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Hurtis Vaughn & Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc..(amf, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 - 1 Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc..(amf, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CSX Transportation, Inc. from Circuit Court of Macon County, Alabama, case number 46-CV-2021-900116.00. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 4602065263) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )
November 18, 2021 COMPLAINT against CSX Transportation, Inc., Vernon Harthorne Clark, Jr., filed by Hurtis Vaughn. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF)(amf, )
November 18, 2021 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by CSX Transportation, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 10 for PDF) (amf, )
November 18, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hurtis Vaughn. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF) (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughn v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hurtis Vaughn
Represented By: Aaron John Luck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Todd Grimes
Represented By: Morris Wade Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Harthorne Clark, Jr.
Represented By: Morris Wade Richardson
Represented By: Charles Todd Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?