Taunton v. Korens USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Landon Taunton
Defendant: Korens USA, Inc. and One Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00844
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: granting #8 Joint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to file an answer and corporate disclosure is extended to 2/28/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 2/14/2022. (NO pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
February 11, 2022 Filing 8 Joint Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Korens USA, Inc., One Solutions, LLC. (Umbach, Arnold) Modified on 2/11/2022 to correct motion event & clean up text (cwl, ).
February 11, 2022 *** Attorney Arnold William Umbach, III terminated for Korens USA, Inc. (confirmed with attorney he does not represent this def). (NO pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: granting #6 UNOPPOSED Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and Corporate Disclosure Statement. The deadline to file an answer and corporate disclosure is extended to February 14, 2022. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 2/3/2022. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
February 2, 2022 ***PURSUANT TO THE #6 MOTION - Attorney Ronald Wayne Flowers, Jr for Korens USA, Inc. added. (NO pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Corporate Disclosure Statement (UNOPPOSED) by Korens USA, Inc.. (Hwang, Ingu)
January 27, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Landon Taunton. One Solutions, LLC served on 1/24/2022, answer due 2/14/2022. (Lowery, Courtney)
January 27, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Landon Taunton. Korens USA, Inc. served on 1/14/2022, answer due 2/4/2022. (Lowery, Courtney)
December 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Korens USA, Inc. & One Solutions, LLC; Returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (amf, )
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Landon Taunton. (cwl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2021: #1 original signature page) (cwl, ).
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 Original COMPLAINT - Collective Action against Korens USA, Inc., One Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602065555.), filed by Landon Taunton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(cwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taunton v. Korens USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landon Taunton
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korens USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ingu Hwang
Represented By: Ronald Wayne Flowers, Jr.
Represented By: Arnold William Umbach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Arnold William Umbach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?