Wilson et al v. Cleveland Brothers Inc. (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Jeffery Wilson and Barry Wilson
Defendant: Cleveland Brothers Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00090
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cleveland Brothers Inc., and given back to Pro Se Plf for service via Process Server. (cwl, )
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE (letter) to the Court by Barry Wilson. (cwl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2022: #1 Original signature page) (cwl, ).
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to the United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 2/28/2022. (cwl, )
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Jeffery Wilson & Barry Wilson. Corporate Disclosures due by 3/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cleveland Brothers Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602066051), filed by Jeffery Wilson, Barry Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 receipt)(cwl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2022: #4 Original signature page) (cwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Cleveland Brothers Inc. (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland Brothers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?