Abrams et al v. Struengmann et al
Plaintiff: Robert S. Abrams and A. Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Athos Service GmbH, Patiro Holding AG, Andreas Biagosch, Thomas Struengmann, Santo Holding AG and Yves Steffen
Case Number: 3:2024cv00554
Filed: August 29, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2024 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J Rochester on behalf of Patiro Holding AG, Santo Holding AG (Rochester, Stephen)
September 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: This action has been DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE by operation of Rule 41; It is further ORDERED that all pending motions are denied as moot, and all deadlines are terminated; DIRECTING the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/20/2024. (AM)
September 20, 2024 Filing 34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Dean, Joseph)
September 19, 2024 Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Patiro Holding AG, Santo Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Taylor, Meredith) Modified on 9/19/2024 to correct motion event (CWL).
September 19, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia B. Mosse on behalf of Patiro Holding AG, Santo Holding AG (Mosse, Julia)
September 17, 2024 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of Patiro Holding AG, Santo Holding AG (Reisman, Steven)
September 16, 2024 Filing 30 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by A. Enterprises, LLC. (Dean, Joseph)
September 16, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. Smith on behalf of Patiro Holding AG, Santo Holding AG (Smith, Robert)
September 10, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE to Chief Judge Marks Regarding Related Bankruptcy Court Proceedings by Patiro Holding AG, Santo Holding AG (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bankruptcy Court Confirmation Order and Chapter 11 Plan, #2 Exhibit Motion to Enforce Plan and Confirmation Order) (Taylor, Meredith) Modified text on 9/11/2024 (CWL). (Main Document 28 replaced on 9/12/2024 pursuant to communication with counsel) (CWL).
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before September 17, 2024, A. Enterprises shall file an amended conflict disclosure statement that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and the Orders of this Court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/10/2024. (CWL)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the motion to admit pro hac vice (doc. #7 ) is GRANTED, and Attorney Allyson Jordan is ADMITTED to appear before this Court pro hac vice to represent Defendants Patiro Holding and Santo Holding in this action. Attorney Jordan shall file a notice of appearance with the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/10/2024. (CWL)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the motion to admit pro hac vice (doc. #6 ) is GRANTED, and Attorney Julia B. Mosse is ADMITTED to appear before this Court pro hac vice to represent Defendants Patiro Holding and Santo Holding in this action. Attorney Mosse shall file a notice of appearance with the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/10/2024. (CWL)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the motion to admit pro hac vice (doc. #5 ) is GRANTED, and Attorney Steven J. Reisman is ADMITTED to appear before this Court pro hac vice to represent Defendants Patiro Holding and Santo Holding in this action. Attorney Reisman shall file a notice of appearance with the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/10/2024. (CWL)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the motion to admit pro hac vice (doc. #4 ) is GRANTED, and Attorney Stephen J. Rochester is ADMITTED to appear before this Court pro hac vice to represent Defendants Patiro Holding and Santo Holding in this action. Attorney Rochester shall file a notice of appearance with the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/10/2024. (CWL)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the motion to admit pro hac vice (doc. #3 ) is GRANTED, and Attorney Robert T. Smith is ADMITTED to appear before this Court pro hac vice to represent Defendants Patiro Holding and Santo Holding in this action. Attorney Smith shall file a notice of appearance with the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/10/2024. (CWL)
September 9, 2024 Filing 21 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by A. Enterprises, LLC re re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Dean, Joseph) Modified text on 9/9/2024 (CWL).
September 9, 2024 Filing 20 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Robert S. Abrams re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Dean, Joseph) Modified text on 9/9/2024 (CWL).
September 5, 2024 ***Attorney's added Robert T. Smith, Stephen Rochester, Steven J. Reisman, Julia B. Mosse, Ally Jordan for Patiro Holding AG and Santo Holding AG. (LAB)
September 5, 2024 Filing 19 Received Pro Hac fee re #7 Motion for Ally Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $ 100.00, receipt number 5838 (CWL)
September 5, 2024 Filing 18 Received Pro Hac fee re #6 Motion for Julia B. Mosse to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $ 100.00, receipt number 5837 (CWL)
September 5, 2024 Filing 17 Received Pro Hac fee re #5 Motion for Steven J. Reisman to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $ 100.00, receipt number 5836 (CWL)
September 5, 2024 Filing 16 Received Pro Hac fee re #4 Motion for Stephen Rochester to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $ 100.00, receipt number 5835 (CWL)
September 5, 2024 Filing 15 Received Pro Hac fee re #3 Motion for Robert T. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $ 100.00, receipt number 5834 (CWL)
September 5, 2024 Filing 14 Received Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 5833 (CWL)
September 5, 2024 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Patiro Holding AG re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Taylor, Meredith) (Main Document 13 replaced on 9/5/2024 to lock down PDF) (CWL).
September 5, 2024 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Santo Holding AG re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Taylor, Meredith) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/5/2024 to lock down PDF) (CWL).
August 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Movants' motion (doc. #2 ) is GRANTED to the extent that their deadline to respond to the Plaintiffs' complaint is EXTENDED until October 7, 2024. In all other respects, the motion (doc. #2 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/30/2024. (CWL)
August 30, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Robert S. Abrams, A. Enterprises, LLC. Corporate Disclosures due by 9/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(CWL)
August 30, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Patiro Holding AG, Santo Holding AG. Corporate Disclosures due by 9/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(CWL)
August 30, 2024 Filing 8 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding Judge and Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams as referral Judge. (CWL)
August 29, 2024 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Patiro Holding AG, Santo Holding AG re #1 Notice of Removal (no pdf - see #1 at page 4) (CWL)
August 29, 2024 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Athos Service GmbH, Andreas Biagosch, Patiro Holding AG, Santo Holding AG, Yves Steffen, Thomas Struengmann, filed by A. Enterprises, LLC, Robert S. Abrams. (no pdf - see #1 -2 at page 2)(CWL)
August 29, 2024 Filing 7 Motion for Ally Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patiro Holding AG, Santo Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Ally Jordan Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Taylor, Meredith) Modified text on 8/30/2024 (CWL). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/30/2024 to correct case number) (CWL). (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/30/2024 to correct case number) (CWL).
August 29, 2024 Filing 6 Motion for Julia B. Mosse to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patiro Holding AG, Santo Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Julia B. Mosse Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Taylor, Meredith) Modified text on 8/30/2024 (CWL). (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/30/2024 to correct case number) (CWL). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/30/2024 to correct case number) (CWL).
August 29, 2024 Filing 5 Motion for Steven J. Reisman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patiro Holding AG, Santo Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Steven J. Reisman Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Taylor, Meredith) Modified text on 8/30/2024 (CWL). (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/30/2024 to correct case number) (CWL).
August 29, 2024 Filing 4 Motion for Stephen Rochester to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patiro Holding AG, Santo Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Stephen Rochester Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Taylor, Meredith) Modified text on 8/30/2024 (CWL). (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/30/2024 to correct case number) (CWL).
August 29, 2024 Filing 3 Motion for Robert T. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patiro Holding AG, Santo Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Robert T. Smith Declaration, #2 Robert T. Smith Certificate of Good Standing) (Taylor, Meredith) Modified text on 8/30/2024 (CWL). (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/30/2024 to correct case number) (CWL).
August 29, 2024 Filing 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Patiro Holding AG, Santo Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Taylor, Meredith) Modified text on 8/30/2024 (CWL).
August 29, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Lee County, Alabama, case number 43-CV-24-00184.00. , filed by Santo Holding AG, Patiro Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit Robert T. Smith Declaration) (Taylor, Meredith) Modified text on 8/30/2024 (CWL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrams et al v. Struengmann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athos Service GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patiro Holding AG
Represented By: Meredith Smith Taylor
Represented By: Steven J. Reisman
Represented By: Robert T. Smith
Represented By: Peter Sean Fruin
Represented By: Julia B. Mosse
Represented By: Ally Jordan
Represented By: Steven J. Reisman
Represented By: Stephen J Rochester
Represented By: Stephen J Rochester
Represented By: Robert T. Smith
Represented By: Julia B. Mosse
Represented By: Ally Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreas Biagosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Struengmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santo Holding AG
Represented By: Meredith Smith Taylor
Represented By: Steven J. Reisman
Represented By: Robert T. Smith
Represented By: Peter Sean Fruin
Represented By: Julia B. Mosse
Represented By: Ally Jordan
Represented By: Steven J. Reisman
Represented By: Stephen J Rochester
Represented By: Stephen J Rochester
Represented By: Robert T. Smith
Represented By: Julia B. Mosse
Represented By: Ally Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yves Steffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S. Abrams
Represented By: Joseph Lowrie Dean, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Lowrie Dean, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?