Allen v. Hampton et al
Plaintiff: Audrey M. Allen
Defendant: Tara Lynn Hampton, Felix Harris and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2025cv00063
Filed: January 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: 1.) Plf's #7 Motion to Remand is GRANTED; and 2.) This action is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Russell County, AL; The Clerk is DIRECTED to take the steps necessary to remand this case to the Russell County Circuit Court and to close the case in this Court. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 3/5/2025. (Certified copies of order and docket sheet mailed to CC of Russell Co.)(BES)
February 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that Plf's #20 Motion Requesting an Extension of Time Pending the Outcome of Plf's Motion to Remand is GRANTED; Plf's deadline to show cause, seek entry of default, or voluntarily dismiss is LIFTED pending further order of the Court. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 2/28/2025. (BES)
February 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Deadline Deadline set in Order dated February 20, 2025 - Deadline to file default against Defendant Hampton re #17 Order,, by Audrey M. Allen. (Loftin, Jorja)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 First MOTION to Remand filed by Audrey M. Allen. (Loftin, Jorja)
February 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. as Presiding Judge and Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams as Referral Judge. Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (BES)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Pursuant to #17 Order- Set Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 2/28/2025. (TPS)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before February 28, 2025, Plaintiff shall do ONE of the following: 1. show cause, in writing, why the claims against Defendant Hampton should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, OR 2. proceed under Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by seeking entry of default and default judgment against Defendant Hampton, OR 3. file a written notice that she wishes to voluntarily dismiss the claims against Defendant Hampton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 2/20/2025. (KR)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Form to Decline Consent to the U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Felix Harris. Declination of Consent to Magistrate Judge due by 3/13/2025. (Attachments: #1 03mc3156 General Order)(GGN)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 First MOTION to Remand and Consent to Federal Court Jurisdiction filed by Felix Harris. (McCarthy, Megan)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Felix Harris. (McCarthy, Megan) Modified on 2/20/2025 to add linkage (GGN).
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Audrey M. Allen. Corporate Disclosures due by 3/3/2025. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(TPS)
February 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 First MOTION to Remand filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Cohan, Michael)
February 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Non-Compliance re #10 Answers to Interrogatories, which is hereby STRICKEN pursuant to the Local Rules re: Non-Filing of Civil Discovery.(GGN)
February 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES RE: NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY) ANSWER to Interrogatories from A. Allen by Audrey M. Allen. (Loftin, Jorja) Modified on 2/14/2025 (GGN).
January 30, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Audrey M. Allen; Corporate Disclosures due by 2/10/2025. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(AM)
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Before the court is the Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Audrey M. Allen. (Doc. No. #7 .) For good cause, it is ORDERED that, on or before February 19, 2025, Defendants shall file a response to the motion. On or before February 26, 2025, Plaintiff shall file a reply, as further set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 1/29/2025. (SCN)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 First MOTION to Remand by Audrey M. Allen. (Loftin, Jorja)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Cohan, Michael)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Form to Decline Consent to the U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Audrey M. Allen and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Declination of Consent to Magistrate Judge due by 2/12/2025. (Attachments: #1 03mc3156 General Order (ECF No.5))(GGN)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams, as Presiding Judge. (GGN)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Tara Lynn Hampton, Felix Harris, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed by Audrey M. Allen. (See Doc. #1 -9)(GGN) Modified on 1/22/2025 (GGN).
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Cohan, Michael)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Notice of Removal filed in State Court (Cohan, Michael)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Russell County, Alabama, case number CV-2024-900317. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AALMDC-3780224) , filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court File) (Cohan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Hampton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Lynn Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Harris
Represented By: Megan Kime McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Joseph Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey M. Allen
Represented By: Jorja Rima Bell Loftin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?