Allen, et al v. Reynolds, et al
Plaintiff: Mary Nixon, Vergena Richardson, Annie C Brockman, Cynthia Rouse, Malinda Wilson, Mary A Caver, Timothy Hall, Charles W Moore, Juanita Thomas, Debora Rowland, Lela Chatman, Sandra K Burns, Patricia A Goodwin, bettye Bowie, Marva Words, Earnestine Hall, Valerie Frankum, Thelma G McClellan, Maggie Johnson, Genene Whisenant, Linda Perry, Robin Fincher, Patricia Lee, Mildred J Russell, Mary Helen Jackson, Carol L Gathright, Henrietta Wright, Christine Robinson, Carolyn Johnson, Carol Smith, Josephine Allen, Tilda C Wilson, Latanya Garrett, Ethel M Almon, Vinniss Virginia Williams, Paula N Atkins, Harold Smith, Bessie E Moore, Ruth Lauderdale, Sharon Woods, Connie McCallum, Geraldine M West, Sharon Reighard, Ollie Cunningham, Inez T Forbes, Patsy Ann Pitts, Mary Jo Boyd, Marie Chauncey, Michael Robinson, Caroline Wah, Veronica Carter, Maggie L Jones, Vanessa Easley, Ruth S Mims, Gisela Morris-Jones, Marjorie Wilkinson, Germaine Thomas, Maggie James and Birdie D Hutchings
Defendant: Johnny Heard, Jack Wood, Robert Rigsby, Beulah Mae Glasgow, Isola Thompson, Southeastern Employees Benefit Services Inc, Harville & Co PC, William Trammel, Sandra Sudduth, Ralph Meade, Paul Maddox, Harold Washington, Gail Sparks-Ashley, Theresa Taylor, Lorenzo Williams, Robert Reich, Robert Downing, Irene Cantrell, Curtis Vinson, M Douglas Ghee, James M Campbell, Ada Evans, Nimrod Q Reynolds, Monroe Lipscomb, Mike Rogers, J D Hess, Rita Stubbs, Alfreda Whatley, Gambrell Associates Inc &, Dean Gambrell, Lonnie Culpepper, Horace Thrower, Bruce Wright, Louise Wilson, Rodney J Griggs, Community Action Agency Calhoun Cleburne Cherokee Counties Inc of and, Clarence E Avery, Richard Hooks, Mary Frances Phillips, Household Insurance Company, Melvin Rogers, Sandra Stoudenmire, Charles Fuller, David Dethrage, Barbara B Boyd, James J O'Brien, Johnny Roberts, CAA Retirement Plan, James A Dunn, Phillip Jordan, Alexander Hamilton Life Insurance Company of America, William A Robinson, James H Askew, Jr, Thomas A Pratt, John H Patty, Miles Sims, Steve Whatley, Lea Fite, Judge Stringer, Leon Smith, Mildred Heard, Jeanette Baxter, Andrew Bowie, Nathaniel Davis, Donald Starr, Ewell Parker, Eli Henderson, Paul R Goodwin, Phillip Pritchett and Richard A Powell
Case Number: 1:1996cv01423
Filed: May 31, 1996
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sam C Pointer
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 1999. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER that the order of the court entered on 11/23/98 dismissing the plas claims against Gambrell, Griggs, Gambrell & Asso with prejudice be deemed final order and that final judgment be entered in favor of Gambrell, Griggs, Gambrell & Associations terminating case filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
March 24, 1999 Filing 245 MOTION by defendant Gambrell Associates, defendant Dean Gambrell, defendant Rodney J Griggs to certify judgment as final filed cs (TLM)
March 8, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER denying motion for accountin [235-1] filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
March 8, 1999 DOCKET modification (utility event) withdrawing attorney attorney Samuel H Heldman for Nimrod Q Reynolds (TLM)
March 5, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 243 - ORDER denying motion to continue hrg [241-1] ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (TLM)
March 5, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 242 239 - ORDER granting motion to withdraw attorney [239-1] Sam Heldman ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (TLM)
March 4, 1999 Filing 241 MOTION by plaintiff to continue hrg filed cs (TLM)
March 1, 1999 Filing 240 OBJECTIONS by defendant Alexander Hamilton to motion for accounting [235-1] filed cs (TLM)
February 23, 1999 Filing 239 MOTION by defendant Nimrod Q Reynolds to withdraw attorney Sam Heldman filed cs (TLM)
February 22, 1999 DOCKET modification (utility event) ; Motion docket set for 3:30 3/5/99 (RLD)
January 21, 1999 Filing 238 RESPONSE by defendant CAA Retirement Plan t plasresponse to trustees objection to motion for accounting [237-1] filed cs (TLM)
January 19, 1999 Filing 237 RESPONSE by plaintiff to trustee Phillip G. Estes objection to motion for accounting [236-1] filed cs (TLM)
January 13, 1999 Filing 236 OBJECTIONS by defendant CAA Retirement Plan to [235-1] motion for accounting filed cs (TLM)
January 12, 1999 Filing 235 MOTION by plaintiff for accountin filed cs (TLM)
November 23, 1998 DOCKET modification (utility event) terminating party Rodney J Griggs, party Dean Gambrell, party Gambrell Associates (TLM)
November 23, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting motion to dismiss of The Gambrell & Griggs [220-1] filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
November 23, 1998 Filing 233 MEMORANDUM opinion filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
November 17, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER denying motion to dismiss [228-1] with leave to refile after distribution of the plan assets; the CAA Retirement Plan, through its attorney and trustee Phillip Estes may proceed forward with a distribution of the retirement assets, CAA Retirement Plan is not precluded from distributing such assets a result of this litigation; following the distribution CAA Retirement Plan may file another motion to dismiss in the event that ll claims against it are thereby moot filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
November 10, 1998 Filing 231 OPPOSITION by plaintiff to dfts motion to dismiss [228-1], motion for judgment [227-1] filed cs (TLM)
October 27, 1998 DOCKET modification (utility event) ; Motion docket set for 3:30 11/13/98 (RLD)
October 1, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting motion for judgment [227-1] ; after carefule review of the case file the court has determined the names of the parties who are currently involved in this action and has provied Mr. Estes with this information in Appendix A to this order. As a result Mr. Estest is ordered to servie only those parties listed in Appendix A in his efforts to distribute the retirement funds filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
September 17, 1998 Filing 229 NOTICE of grounds in support of motion for declaratory judgment filed by defendant CAA Retirement Plan cs (TLM)
September 17, 1998 Filing 228 MOTION by defendant CAA Retirement Plan to dismiss filed cs (TLM)
August 18, 1998 DOCKET modification (utility event) ; Motion docket set for 3:30 8/27/98 (RLD)
July 24, 1998 Filing 227 MOTION by defendant CAA Retirement Plan for judgment filed cs (TLM)
July 21, 1998 DOCKET modification (utility event) granting motion to withdraw attorney P Camille Lamar [225-1] attorney P Camille Lamar for Community Act Agency (TLM)
July 21, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 226 225 - ORDER granting motion to withdraw attorney P Camille Lamar [225-1] ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (TLM)
July 14, 1998 Filing 225 MOTION by defendant Community Act Agency to withdraw attorney P Camille Lamar filed cs (TLM)
July 2, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting motion for certification of judgment of 3/27/98 as final [221-1] as to Alexander Hamilton Life Ins Co wiht prejudice and hereby is a final order and taht final judgment be and the same hereby entered in favor of Alexander Hamilton Life Ins Co and againist the plas filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
June 15, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 223 222 - ORDER granting plff's motion to extend time to 5/28/98 [222-1] ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (Former Employee)
May 28, 1998 Filing 222 MOTION by plaintiff to extend time filed cs (TLM)
May 18, 1998 DOCKET modification (utility event) ; Motion docket set for 3:30 5/29/98 (RLD)
April 20, 1998 Filing 221 MOTION by defendant Alexander Hamilton Life Ins Co for certification of judgment of 3/27/98 as final filed cs (Former Employee)
April 16, 1998 Filing 220 MOTION by defendant Gambrell Associates, defendant Dean Gambrell, defendant Rodney J Griggs to dismiss filed cs (TLM)
April 16, 1998 Filing 219 NOTICE of appearance for defendant CAA Retirement Plan by Phillip G Estes filed cs (TLM)
March 27, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting & denying in part Grambrells motion to dismiss complaint [209-1]; Gambrells motion is Granted as to plas state law claims, plas statle law claims against Gambrell are dismissed with prejudice/ Gambrell's motion is Denied as to plas claims against Gambrell under RICO & ERISA filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
March 25, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting motion to dismiss [212-1] Alexander Hamiltons; plas claims against Alexander Hamilton are dismissed w/prejudice filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
March 25, 1998 Filing 217 MEMORANDUM opinion filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
March 25, 1998 Filing 215 MEMORANDUM opinion filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
September 24, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting motion for order to be made final [211-1] dismissing Charles r. Fullerfiled ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
August 28, 1997 Filing 213 OPPOSITION by plaintiff to dfts Dean Gambrell & Gambrell & Assoc and Roderick J. Griggs motion to dismiss complaint [209-1] filed cs (TLM)
August 22, 1997 Filing 212 MOTION by defendant Alexander Hamilton to dismiss filed cs (TLM)
August 18, 1997 DOCKET modification (utility event) withdrawing attorney attorney Polly Enger Russell for Robert Downing (TLM)
August 18, 1997 DOCKET modification (utility event) ; Motion docket set for 3:30 8/29/97 (RLD)
August 5, 1997 Filing 211 MOTION by defendant Charles Fuller for order to be made final filed cs (TLM)
June 30, 1997 Filing 210 ANSWER by defendant CAA Retirement Plan w/appear by atty(s) filed cs (TLM)
June 26, 1997 Filing 209 MOTION by Gambrell Associates, Dean Gambrell, Rodney J Griggs to dismiss complaint filed cs w/exhs att (CJV)
June 6, 1997 Filing 208 AMENDMENT to complaint amending Count III filed by plaintiffs; adding plas Bettye Bowie, Marie Chauncey, Timothy Hall, Maggie L Jones, Maggie Johnson, Harold Smith, Caroline Wah, Malinda Wilson, Sharon Woods filed cs (Former Employee)
June 6, 1997 Filing 207 NOTICE of Amendment filed by plaintiff cs (Former Employee) Modified on 06/09/1997
May 19, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting motion to reinstate motion to dismiss [133-1], granting motion to dismiss [131-1] dismissing party Household Ins Co ; plaintiff's given leave to amend their complaint w/in 20 days to state any causes against Alexander Hamilton filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (CJV)
May 13, 1997 DOCKET modification (utility event) withdrawing attorney attorney Donald W Stewart for CAA Retirement Plan, attorney Charles H Rice for CAA Retirement Plan, attorney Bruce N Adams for CAA Retirement Plan , we withdrawing attorney attorney Bruce N Adams for Community Act Agency, attorney Community Act Agency for Community Act Agency , withdrawing attorney attorney James S Hubbard for Gail Sparks-Ashley, attorney Gail Sparks-Ashley for Gail Sparks-Ashley (TLM)
April 24, 1997 DOCKET modification (utility event) ; Motion docket set for 3:00 5/9/97 (RLD)
April 23, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 203 186 - ORDER finding the opposition [186-1] moot; motion for reconsideration already denied ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (DWC)
April 23, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting motion for summary judgment [180-1] terminating party Ralph Meade filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
April 23, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER due to an clerical error Culpeppers name was omitted from Exhibit A of the order entered on 2/6/97 in which current and former members of the Communityu Action Agency Bd of Directions were dismissed; therefore for the reasons state in that order the claims against Culpepper are due to be dismissed terminating party Lonnie Culpepper filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
April 22, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 202 193 - ORDER granting motion to dismiss pty Sharon Wood [193-1] party Sharon Woods ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (TLM)
April 22, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 201 192 - ORDER granting motion to dismiss pty Gayle Sparks - Ashley [192-1] party Gail Sparks-Ashley ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (TLM)
April 22, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 200 191 - ORDER granting motion to dismiss pty Mary Phillips [191-1] party Mary Frances Phillips terminating ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (TLM)
April 22, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 199 97 - ORDER finding the motion to dismiss [97-1] moot ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (TLM)
April 22, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 198 42 - ORDER finding the motion to dismiss [42-1] moot, finding the motion for more definite statement [42-1] moot, finding the motion to dismiss/strike [42-2] moot ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (TLM)
April 22, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 197 153 - ORDER finding the motion to extend discovery [153-1] moot ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (TLM)
April 22, 1997 Filing 194 NOTICE of appearance for plaintiff Josephine Allen by Ronald O Gaiser Jr filed cs (Former Employee)
April 18, 1997 Filing 205 NOTICE (Proposed planning schedule) filed by plaintiff cs (TLM)
April 18, 1997 Filing 204 NOTICE (Proposed Planning Schedule) filed by defendant Nimrod Q Reynolds cs (TLM)
April 18, 1997 Filing 193 MOTION by plaintiff to dismiss pty Sharon Wood filed cs (TLM)
April 18, 1997 Filing 192 MOTION by plaintiff to dismiss pty Gayle Sparks - Ashley filed cs (TLM)
April 18, 1997 Filing 191 MOTION by plaintiff to dismiss pty Mary Phillips filed cs (TLM)
April 8, 1997 DOCKET modification (utility event) ; Pretrial scheduling conf set for 11:00 4/22/97 (RLD)
March 13, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER finding the motion to extend time [181-1] moot all motions have already been carried forward sixty days in order to allow CAA to obtain new counselfiled ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
March 11, 1997 Filing 190 ANSWER by defendant Rodney J Griggs w/appear by atty(s) filed cs (TLM)
March 11, 1997 Filing 189 ANSWER by defendant Rodney J Griggs w/appear by atty(s) Joseph Allen Schreiber to amended complalint filed cs (TLM)
March 11, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 187 184 - ORDER granting motion to withdraw atty Donald W Stewart [184-1] attorney Donald W Stewart for Community Act Agency ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (TLM)
March 10, 1997 Filing 186 OPPOSITION by defendant Charles Fuller to motion for reconsideration [174-1] filed cs (TLM)
March 5, 1997 Filing 185 ANSWER by defendant Nimrod Q Reynolds filed cs (Former Employee)
March 4, 1997 Filing 184 MOTION by Community Act Agency to withdraw atty Donald W Stewart filed cs (CJV)
March 3, 1997 Filing 182 NOTICE of appearance for defendant Community Act Agency by Cleophus Thomas Jr, P Camille Lamar filed cs (TLM)
February 28, 1997 Filing 183 NOTICE of appearance for defendant Dean Gambrell, defendant Rodney J Griggs by Laura C Nettles filed cs (TLM)
February 28, 1997 Filing 181 MOTION by plaintiff to extend time filed cs (TLM)
February 27, 1997 Filing 180 MOTION by defendant Ralph Meade for summary judgment filed cs (Former Employee)
February 27, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER Case stayed 60 days to allow CAA an opportunity to employ new legal counsel; all pending motions will be carried forward for sixty days filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
February 25, 1997 Filing 178 OPPOSITION by defendant James A Dunn, defendant Robert Downing, defendant Phillip Pritchett, defendant Charles Fuller, defendant Eli Henderson, defendant J D Hess to motion for reconsideration [174-1] filed cs (TLM)
February 21, 1997 Filing 177 OPPOSITION by defendant Melvin Rogers, defendant James H Askew Jr, defendant Leon Smith, defendant Horace Thrower to motion for reconsideration [174-1] filed cs (TLM)
February 20, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER denying motion for reconsideration of order dismissing John Patty [172-1], denying motion for reconsideration of order Beulah Mae Glasgow [173-1], denying motion for reconsideration [174-1] filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
February 18, 1997 Filing 175 OPPOSITION by defendant Clarence E Avery etal to plas moton to reconsider 2/5/97 order of dismissal of CAA Director for failure to state a claim filed cs (TLM)
February 14, 1997 Filing 174 MOTION by plaintiff for reconsideration of order dismissing the Members Bd of the Community Action Agency of Calhoun, Cleburne, & Cherokee Counties Inc filed cs (TLM)
February 14, 1997 Filing 173 MOTION by plaintiff for reconsideration of order Beulah Mae Glasgow filed cs (TLM)
February 14, 1997 Filing 172 MOTION by plaintiff for reconsideration of order dismissing John Patty filed cs (TLM)
February 6, 1997 DOCKET modification (utility event) pursuant to Exhibit A attached to DOC #166: terminating dfts James H Askew, Clarence E Avery, Jeanette Baxter, Andrew Bowie, Barbara B Boyd, James M Campbell, Irene Cantrell, David Dethrage, Robert Downing, James A Dunn, Ada Evans, Lea Fite, Charles Fuller, M Douglas Ghee, Paul R Goodwin, Monroe Lipscomb, Phillip Jordan, Richard Hooks, Eli Henderson, J D Hess, Mildred Heard, Johnny Heard, Paul Maddox, James J O'Brien, Ewell Parker, Richard A Powell, Thomas A Pratt, Phillip Pritchett, Robert Rigsby, Johnny Roberts, William A Robinson, Mike Rogers, Miles Sims, Leon Smith, Donald Starr, Judge Stringer, Rita Stubbs, Sandra Sudduth, Theresa Taylor, Horace Thrower, William Trammel, Curtis Vinson, Harold Washington Steve Whatley, Alfreda Whatley, Lorenzo Williams, Louise Wilson, Jack Wood, Bruce Wright (SCL)
February 6, 1997 DOCKET modification (utility event) terminating motion to dismiss Isola Thompson [157-1], motion to stay discovery [156-1], motion to dismiss amendment to complaint [130-1], motion to strike amendment to complaint [130-2], motion to dismiss [128-1], motion to dismiss [127-1], motion to dismiss [126-1], motion to strike an exhibit [126-2], motion to dismiss [123-1], motion to dismiss amended complaint [122-1], motion to dismiss [97-1], motion to dismiss [98-1], motion to dismiss [94-1], motion for more definite statement [90-1], motion to dismiss [78-1], motion to dismiss [35-1], motion to dismiss [34-1], motion to dismiss [31-1], motion for more definite statement [31-2], motion to dismiss [30-1], motion to dismiss [32-1], motion for summary judgment [24-1], motion to dismiss [21-1], motion to dismiss [19-1], motion for more definite statement [19-1], motion to dismiss [18-1], motion for more definite statement [18-1], motion to dismiss [17-1], motion for more definite statement [17-1], motion to dismiss [16-1], motion for more definite statement [16-1], motion to dismiss [15-1], motion for more definite statement [15-1], motion to dismiss [14-1], motion for more definite statement [14-1], motion to dismiss [13-1], motion to dismiss [9-1], motion to dismiss [6-1], motion to dismiss [7-1], motion to dismiss [5-1], motion to dismiss [4-1] (SCL)
February 6, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER finding motion to compel [148-1] moot; finding motion to extend time to 2/29/97 to ans/interrog & req for production [147-1] moot; denying motions for default judgment against Sandra Stoudenmire [56-1] Johnny Heard [55-1] Monroe Lipscomb [54-1] Alfreda Whatley [52-1] Theresa Taylor [51-1] Rodney J Griggs [47-1]; claims against dfts Glasgow, M Rogers, Patty & Thompson are DISMISSED w/PREJ; terminating dfts Isola Thompson, Melvin Rogers John H Patty, Beulah Mae Glasgow ; claims against dfts as set out in attached exh A are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim dft Reynolds' motion for stay is DENIED filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (SCL) Modified on 02/06/1997
February 5, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 171 68 - ORDER denying motion to strike answer of Paul Goodwin [68-1] ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (SCL)
February 5, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 170 94 - ORDER denying motion to dismiss [94-1] ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (SCL)
February 5, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 169 13 - ORDER denying motion to dismiss [13-1] ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (SCL)
February 5, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 168 71 - ORDER denying motion to strike answer of Harold Washington [71-1] ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (SCL)
February 5, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 167 69 - ORDER denying motion to strike answser of Jeanette Baxter [69-1] ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (SCL)
February 5, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 165 160 - ORDER finding the motion for summary judgment [160-1] moot ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (SCL)
February 5, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 164 36 - ORDER finding the motion for mediation [36-1] moot ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (SCL)
February 5, 1997 DOCKET modification (utility event) granting motion to withdraw attorney Allison O Skinner [158-1] attorney Allison O Skinner for Charles Fuller [modifying docket sheet in acc w/doc 162, 163] (SNH)
February 5, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 163 159 - ORDER granting appearance by attorney Charles Fuller attorney [159-1] ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (SNH)
February 5, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 162 158 - ORDER granting motion to withdraw attorney Allison O Skinner [158-1] ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (SNH)
February 4, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting motion to reinstate motion to dismiss [133-1]i as set out in this order filed ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (CJV)
February 3, 1997 Filing 160 MOTION by defendant William Trammel for summary judgment w/exh att thereto filed cs (SCL)
February 3, 1997 Filing 159 NOTICE of appearance for dft Charles Fuller by James H Wilson filed cs (Former Employee)
February 3, 1997 Filing 158 MOTION by defendant Charles Fuller to withdraw attorney Allison O Skinner filed cs (Former Employee)
January 29, 1997 Filing 157 MOTION by plaintiff to dismiss Isola Thompson filed cs (TLM)
January 28, 1997 Filing 156 MOTION by defendant Nimrod Q Reynolds to stay discovery filed cs (TLM)
January 27, 1997 Filing 155 MOTION by defendant CAA Retirement Plan to stay filed cs (TLM)
January 27, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 154 151 - ORDER denying motion to continue status conference [151-1] ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (TLM)
January 21, 1997 Filing 153 MOTION by plaintiff to extend discovery filed cs (TLM)
January 21, 1997 Filing 152 MOTION by plaintiff Josephine Allen to withdraw objection to mt to withdraw filed cs (TLM)
January 21, 1997 Filing 151 MOTION by plaintiff to continue status conference filed cs (TLM)
January 21, 1997 DOCKET modification (utility event) terminating motion to withdraw objection to mt to withdraw [152-1] (TLM)
January 13, 1997 Filing 150 SUBMISSION of discovery by defendant Isola Thompson in support of motion for sumjgm filed (TLM)
January 6, 1997 Opinion or Order 142 - ORDER granting motion to alter or amend [142-1], granting motion for reconsideration of 10/24/96 order [142-2] ( by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) entered cm (Former Employee)
December 23, 1996 Filing 149 OBJECTIONS by defendant Isola Thompson to [147-1] filed cs (TLM)
December 23, 1996 Filing 148 MOTION by defendant Isola Thompson to compel filed cs (TLM)
December 20, 1996 Filing 147 MOTION by Josephine Allen to extend time to 2/29/97 to answer interrogatories and request for production filed cs (Former Employee)
December 18, 1996 Filing 146 NOTICE of appearance for defendant Nimrod Q Reynolds by Richard P Rouco filed cs (Former Employee)
December 18, 1996 Filing 145 NOTICE of appearance for Community Act Agency by Donald Stewart filed cs (Former Employee)
December 10, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER ; Status hearing to be held on 2:00 1/29/97 a brief ing schedule will be set at the conference to address the many outstanding motions in the case filed by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr ) cm (TLM)
November 13, 1996 DOCKET modification (utility event) Case reassigned to Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer Jr per direction of Judge Pointer (class actions on Judge Hancock's recusal list) (Former Employee)
November 12, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Case reassigned to Judge James H. Hancock because Donald W. Stewart is on recusal list filed ( by Judge Robert B. Propst ) cm (Former Employee)
November 5, 1996 Filing 142 MOTION by CAA Retirement Plan to alter or amend , or for reconsideration of 10/24/96 order filed cs (Former Employee)
November 4, 1996 Opinion or Order ORDER Case reassigned to Judge Robert B. Propst Cooper, Mitch on Judge Acker's recusal list filed ( by Judge William M. Acker Jr ) cm (Former Employee) Modified on 11/04/1996
October 30, 1996 Filing 141 NOTICE of appearance for defendant Johnny Roberts by John M Fraley filed cs (Former Employee)
October 29, 1996 Filing 140 NOTICE of appearance for CAA Retirement Plan by Donald W Stewart filed cs (Former Employee)
October 24, 1996 DOCKET modification (utility event) to dismiss party Robert B Reich see order doc #139 (Former Employee)
October 24, 1996 Opinion or Order 135 - ORDER finding the CAA's motion to strike objection to motion to withdraw attorneys [135-1] moot ( by Judge William M. Acker Jr ) entered cm (Former Employee)
October 24, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM, opinion, and order: filed ( by Judge William M. Acker Jr ) denying CAA's motion to withdraw attys Charles H Rice and Bruce N Adams [137-1], [132-1], granting Sec of Labor Reich's motion to dismiss [40-1] that Robert Reich Sec of Labor is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Rule 54(b) that there is no just cause for delay of final judgment in favor of Reich and against plffs and such judgment is DEEMED ENTERED; parties are GRANTED leave to engage in discovery for 90 days; plff shall amend complaint by 1/31/97 cm (Former Employee)
October 21, 1996 Filing 138 BRIEF in response to court's inquiry of 8/5/96 by Robert B Reich Secretary of Dept of Labor filed cs (Former Employee)
October 21, 1996 Filing 137 MOTION by Community Act Agency to withdraw attys Charles H Rice and Bruce N Adams filed cs (CJV)
October 17, 1996 Filing 136 OBJECTIONS by plaintiffs to CAA of Calhoun, Cleburne & Cherokee Ctys to withdraw attorneys Rice and Adams [132-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
October 15, 1996 Filing 135 MOTION by CAA Retirement Plan to strike objection to motion to withdraw attorneys filed cs (Former Employee)
October 2, 1996 Filing 134 ANSWER to amendment to complaint by Bruce Wright filed cs (Former Employee)
October 1, 1996 Filing 133 MOTION by Alexander Hamilton to reinstate motion to dismiss and acceptance of service of process filed cs (Former Employee)
September 30, 1996 Filing 132 MOTION by CAA Retirement Plan to withdraw attorneys Rice and Adams filed cs (Former Employee)
September 24, 1996 Filing 131 MOTION by Household Ins Co to dismiss filed cs (Former Employee)
September 19, 1996 Filing 130 MOTION by Robert Downing, James A Dunn, J D Hess, Eli Henderson, Phillip Pritchett to dismiss amendment to complaint , or in alternative to strike amendment to complaint filed cs (Former Employee)
September 18, 1996 Filing 129 ANSWER to amended complaint by James H Askew Jr, Melvin Rogers, Leon Smith, Horace Thrower filed cs (Former Employee)
September 18, 1996 Filing 128 MOTION (12(b)(6) by Beulah Mae Glasgow, Paul Maddox, Johnny Roberts to dismiss filed (Former Employee)
September 18, 1996 Filing 127 MOTION (12(b)(6) by John H Patty to dismiss filed (Former Employee)
September 18, 1996 DOCKET modification (utility event) terminating motion for default judgment against Paul Maddox [53-1], terminating motion for default judgment against Johnny Roberts [50-1], terminating motion for default judgment against John H Patty [49-1] (see doc #85 order) (Former Employee)
September 18, 1996 DOCKET modification (utility event) terminating motion for default judgment against Jack Wood [48-1] see doc 85 (SNH)
September 17, 1996 Filing 126 MOTION (renewed) by Charles Fuller to dismiss , or in alternative to strike an exhibit filed cs (Former Employee)
September 17, 1996 Filing 125 ANSWER to amendment to complaint by defendant Gail Sparks-Ashley filed cs (Former Employee)
September 17, 1996 Filing 124 ANSWER to amendment to complaint by defendant Barbara B Boyd filed cs (Former Employee)
September 17, 1996 Filing 123 MOTION by dfts Avery, Body, Bowie, Campbell, Cantrell, Culpepper, Davis, Evans, Fite, Goodwin, Ghee, Glasgow, Hooks, Heard, Jordan, Maddox, Mead, Patty, parker, Powell, Pratt, Rigsby, Roberts, Rogers, Stringer, Stubbs, Sudduth, Trammel, Vincent, Whatley, Williams, Wilson to dismiss filed cs (Former Employee)
September 13, 1996 Filing 122 MOTION by dfts Paul R Goodwin, and Richard Hooks to dismiss amended complaint filed cs (SNH)
September 13, 1996 Filing 121 NOTICE of appearance for dfts, Dr. Paul Goodwin and Dr. Richard Hooks by Christopher M Hopkins filed cs (SNH)
September 12, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER striking Barbara Boyd's answer [119-1] for violation of Rule 11 with leave to refile within 7 days filed ( by Judge William M. Acker Jr ) cm (Former Employee)
September 12, 1996 Filing 119 ANSWER to amendment to complaint by defendant Barbara B Boyd filed cs (Former Employee)
September 11, 1996 Filing 118 ANSWER by Monroe Lipscomb to amendment to complaint filed cs (Former Employee)
September 9, 1996 Filing 117 ANSWER to amended complaint by defendant Community Act Agency filed cs (Former Employee)
September 6, 1996 Filing 116 SUMMONS and complaint returned executed: upon defendant Household Ins Co on 9/5/96 filed (Former Employee)
September 4, 1996 SUMMONS and complaint and amended complaint issued on Household Insurance Company, mailed certified mail (Former Employee) Modified on 09/04/1996
September 4, 1996 Filing 114 REQUEST of plaintiff for service by certified mail on Household Insurance Company filed (Former Employee)
September 3, 1996 Filing 113 AMENDED complaint refiled with leave of court , by plaintiffs dismissing party Alexander Hamilton; adding Household Ins Co filed cs (Former Employee)
September 3, 1996 Opinion or Order 106 - ORDER granting plff's motion to amend complaint [106-1] by Judge William M. Acker Jr ) entered cm (Former Employee)
August 30, 1996 Filing 115 RESPONSE (received 8/30/96) by plaintiffs to Jack Wood and Johnny Heard's motion to dismiss [34-1], answer [34-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
August 30, 1996 Filing 112 ANSWER to amendment to complaint by defendant Isola Thompson filed cs (Former Employee)
August 30, 1996 Filing 111 RESPONSE by plaintiff to Boyd's motion to dismiss [31-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
August 30, 1996 Filing 110 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to Wright's motion to dismiss filed cs (Former Employee)
August 30, 1996 Filing 109 RESPONSE by plaintiff to Henderson's motion to dismiss [15-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
August 30, 1996 Filing 108 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to Griggs' motion to dismiss [94-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
August 30, 1996 Filing 107 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to Reynolds' motion to dismiss [13-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
August 30, 1996 Filing 106 MOTION by plaintiffs to amend complaint filed cs (Former Employee) Modified on 09/04/1996
August 29, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER striking plff's amendment to complaint [104-1] for filing without leave of court with leave to refile within 7 days filed ( by Judge William M. Acker Jr ) cm (Former Employee)
August 28, 1996 Filing 104 AMENDMENT OF CLASS ACTION complaint filed, by plaintiff [80-1], [79-1], [1-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
August 26, 1996 Opinion or Order 99 - ORDER granting Lipscomb's motion for leave to file late answer [99-1] ( by Judge William M. Acker Jr ) entered cm (Former Employee)
August 22, 1996 Filing 103 ANSWER by dfts David Dethrage, and William A Robinson filed cs (Former Employee)
August 20, 1996 Filing 102 ANSWER to amendment to paragraph 42 of complaint by defendant Charles Fuller filed cs (Former Employee)
August 20, 1996 Filing 101 ANSWER to amendment ot complaint by defendants Robert Downing, James A Dunn, J D Hess, Eli Henderson, Phillip Pritchett filed cs (Former Employee)
August 19, 1996 Opinion or Order 37 - ORDER granting motion to withdraw attorney Bob Humphries [37-1] for Beulah Mae Glasgow ( by Judge William M. Acker Jr ) entered cm (Former Employee)
August 16, 1996 Filing 100 AFFIDAVIT of H. Bruce Wright filed cs (Former Employee)
August 16, 1996 Filing 99 MOTION by defendant Monroe Lipscomb for leave to file late answer with affidavit of Douglas Ghee attached filed cs (Former Employee)
August 16, 1996 Filing 98 MOTION by dfts Avery, Bowie, Boyd, Campbell, Cantrell, Culpepper, Davis, Evans, Fite, Ghee, Glasgow, Heard, Jordan, Lipscomb, Maddox, Mead, patty, Parker,Powell, Pratt, Rigsby, Roberts, Rogers, Stringer, Stubbs, Sudduth, Trammel, Vincent, Whatley, Williams, Wilson to dismiss filed cs (Former Employee)
August 16, 1996 Filing 97 MOTION by dft Gail Sparks-Ashley to dismiss filed cs (Former Employee)
August 16, 1996 Filing 96 ANSWER by defendants David Dethrage, and William A Robinson filed cs (Former Employee)
August 16, 1996 Filing 95 AFFIDAVIT of Eli Henderson filed cs (Former Employee)
August 14, 1996 Filing 94 MOTION by defendant Rodney J Griggs to dismiss filed cs (Former Employee)
August 14, 1996 Filing 93 RESPONSE by dfts Gambrell Associates, Dean Gambrell in further support of th eir 12(b)(6) defenses filed cs (Former Employee)
August 13, 1996 Filing 92 NOTICE of appearance for defendant Charles Fuller by Connie Ray Stockham and Allison Skinner filed cs (Former Employee)
August 12, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER that Clerk is directed to mail counsel for dft Bruce Wright copy of order entered 8/5/96 filed ( by Judge William M. Acker Jr ) cm (Former Employee)
August 9, 1996 Filing 90 ANSWER by defendant Bruce Wright w/appear by atty(s) Burgin H Kent filed in body of motion for more definite statement cs (Former Employee)
August 6, 1996 Filing 89 NOTICE of appearance for defendant Gail Sparks-Ashley by attorney James S Hubbard filed cs (Former Employee)
August 6, 1996 Filing 88 ANSWER to amended complaint by defendants Gambrell Associates, and Dean Gambrell filed cs (Former Employee)
August 5, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting Alexander Hamilton Life Ins' motion to dismiss [77-1], [76-1] without prejudice rendering temporarily MOOT said putative dft's alternative motion under 12(b)(6) which will be considered when proper service is obtained; all papers submitted by plff shall be DEEMED filed to conform to Rule 11; dfts are given until 8/16/96 to respond to 12(b)(6) motions; Sec of Labor shall submit brief with respect to ERISA filed ( by Judge William M. Acker Jr ) cm (Former Employee)
August 2, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting dfts Avery etc.'s motion for order to adopt and conform all motions filed by other dfts [75-1] filed ( by Judge William M. Acker Jr ) cm (Former Employee)
August 2, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting dft Maddox, Patty and Roberts' motion for leave to file answer out of time [74-1] filed ( by Judge William M. Acker Jr ) cm (Former Employee)
August 2, 1996 Filing 84 NOTICE of filing of certificate of AL Dept of Ins filed by defendant Alexander Hamilton cs (Former Employee)
August 2, 1996 Filing 83 NOTICE of appearance for defendants Mary Frances Phillips, and Sharon Woods by attorney Thomas W Harmon filed cs (Former Employee)
August 2, 1996 Filing 82 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to Robert Reich's motion to dismiss [40-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
August 2, 1996 Filing 81 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to Alexander Hamilton Life Ins' motions to dismiss [77-1], [76-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
August 2, 1996 Filing 80 AMENDMENT tocomplaint filed by plaintiffs [79-1], [1-1] re: paragraph 42 filed cs (Former Employee)
August 2, 1996 Filing 79 AMENDMENT complaint filed by plaintiffs [1-1] pertaining to paragraph re: dft Robert Reich filed cs (Former Employee)
August 2, 1996 Filing 78 MOTION 12(B)(6) by defendant Monroe Lipscomb to dismiss filed (Former Employee)
July 31, 1996 Filing 77 MOTION (substitute) by defendant Alexander Hamilton to dismiss filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 76 MOTION by defendant Alexander Hamilton to dismiss filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 CERTIFICATE of service by attorney Hopkins of entry of appearance for dft Glasgow; motion to adopt and conform; motion for leave to file answers out of time; answre of John Patty (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 75 MOTION by dfts Clarence E Avery, Andrew Bowie, Barbara B Boyd, James M Campbell, Irene Cantrell, Lonnie Culpepper, Ada Evans, Lea Fite, M Douglas Ghee, Beulah Mae Glasgow, Mildred Heard, Phillip Jordan, Paul Maddox, John H Patty, Richard A Powell, Thomas A Pratt, Robert Rigsby, Johnny Roberts, Mike Rogers, Judge Stringer, Rita Stubbs, Sandra Sudduth, Curtis Vinson, Steve Whatley, Lorenzo Williams, Louise Wilson, Ralph Meade, Ewell Parker, William Trammel, Nathaniel Davis for order to adopt and conform all motions filed by other dfts filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 74 MOTION by defendants Paul Maddox, John H Patty, Johnny Roberts for leave to file answer out of time filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 73 NOTICE of appearance for defendant Beulah Mae Glasgow by attorney Christopher M Hopkins filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 72 Report of Parties (form 35) of compliance with FRCP 26 filed (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 71 MOTION by plaintiffs to strike answer of Harold Washington filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 70 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to CAA's motion to dismiss/strike [42-2] filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 69 MOTION by plaintiffs to strike answser of Jeanette Baxter filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 68 MOTION by plaintiffs to strike answer of Paul Goodwin filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 67 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to Boyd's motion for more definite statement [31-2] filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 66 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to Pritchett's motion for more definite statement [17-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 65 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to Hess' motion for more definite statement [16-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 64 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to Henderson's motion for more definite statement [15-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 63 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to Dunn's motion for more definite statement [19-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 62 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to Fuller's motion to dismiss [18-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 61 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to Glasgow's motion to dismiss [21-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 60 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to Roger's motion to dismiss [4-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 59 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to Askew's motion to dismiss [9-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 58 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to Thompson's motion for sumjgm filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 57 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to Downing's motion for more definite statement [14-1] filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 56 MOTION by plaintiff for default judgment against Sandra Stoudenmire filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 55 MOTION by plaintiff for default judgment against Johnny Heard filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 54 MOTION by plaintiff for default judgment against Monroe Lipscomb filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 53 MOTION by plaintiff for default judgment against Paul Maddox filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 52 MOTION by plaintiff for default judgment against Alfreda Whatley filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 51 MOTION by plaintiff for default judgment against Theresa Taylor filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 50 MOTION by plaintiff for default judgment against Johnny Roberts filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 49 MOTION by plaintiff for default judgment against John H Patty filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 48 MOTION by plaintiff for default judgment against Jack Wood filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 47 MOTION by plaintiff for default judgment against Rodney J Griggs filed cs (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 46 SUMMONS and complaint returned executed: on Secretary of Treasurer Robert Rubin on 7/27/96 filed (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 45 SUMMONS and complaint returned executed: upon defendant Department of Labor Secretary Robert Reich on 6/1/96 filed (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 44 SUMMONS and complaint returned executed: upon defendant Bruce Wright on 7/24/96 filed (Former Employee)
July 30, 1996 Filing 43 SUMMONS and complaint returned executed: upon defendants Alexander Hamilton, Harville & Co PC, Gambrell Associates on 7/25/96, and Rodney J Griggs on 7/24/96 filed (Former Employee)
July 25, 1996 Filing 42 MOTION (12(b)(6) by defendant CAA Retirement Plan to dismiss filed (Former Employee)
July 25, 1996 Filing 41 NOTICE of appearance for defendant Community Act Agency by attorneys Charles H Rice, and Bruce N Adams filed cs (Former Employee)
July 25, 1996 Filing 40 MOTION by defendant Robert Reich to dismiss filed cs (Former Employee)
July 19, 1996 Filing 39 NOTICE of appearance for defendant Alexander Hamilton Life Ins Co by John M Johnson, Sara Anne Ford, John Q Somerville filed cs (Former Employee)
July 16, 1996 Filing 38 ANSWER by defendants Gambrell Associates, and Dean Gambrell filed cs (Former Employee)
July 10, 1996 Filing 37 MOTION by defendant Beulah Mae Glasgow to withdraw attorney Bob Humphries filed cs (Former Employee)
July 3, 1996 Filing 36 MOTION by dfts Avery, Bowie, Boyd, J.Campbell, Cantrell, Culpepper, Davis, Evans, Fite, Ghee, M.Heard, Jordan, Maddox, Mead, Patty, Parker, Powell, Pratt, Rigsby, Roberts, ROgers, Stringer, Stubbs, Sudduth, Trammel, Vincent, Whatley, Williams, Wilson for mediation filed cs (Former Employee)
July 3, 1996 Filing 35 MOTION (12(b)(6) by defendants Curtis Vinson, and Ralph Meade to dismiss filed (Former Employee)
July 3, 1996 Filing 34 MOTION (12()(6) by defendants Johnny Heard, and Jack Wood to dismiss filed (Former Employee)
July 1, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ; Status hearing to be held on 9:00 8/2/96 filed ( by Judge William M. Acker Jr ) cm (Former Employee)
June 26, 1996 Filing 32 MOTION (12(b)(6) by defendants David Dethrage, and William A Robinson to dismiss filed (Former Employee)
June 26, 1996 Filing 31 MOTION by defendant Barbara B Boyd to dismiss , or in atlernative for more definite statement filed cs (Former Employee)
June 26, 1996 Filing 30 MOTION 129B)(6) by dfts in doc #30 to dismiss filed cs (Former Employee)
June 26, 1996 Filing 29 ANSWER by defendant Jeanette Baxter that Community Action Agency has been dissolved and no longer meet and they are barred from conducting business on behalf of agency and we could not respond at present time filed cs (Former Employee)
June 26, 1996 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of James Askew filed cs (Former Employee)
June 26, 1996 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Melvin Rodgers filed cs (Former Employee)
June 25, 1996 Filing 26 SUMMONS and complaint returned executed: upon defendant Alfreda Whatley on 6/20/96 filed (Former Employee)
June 25, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that parties are reminded of obligation under Rules 26 and 16 of FRCP; if case proceeds to trial it will be held in Birmingham filed ( by Judge William M. Acker Jr ) cm (Former Employee)
June 25, 1996 Filing 24 MOTION by defendant Isola Thompson for summary judgment filed cs (Former Employee)
June 25, 1996 Filing 23 ANSWER by defendant Richard Hooks filed cs (Former Employee)
June 24, 1996 Filing 22 ANSWER by defendant Isola Thompson filed cs (Former Employee)
June 24, 1996 Filing 21 MOTION by defendant Beulah Mae Glasgow to dismiss filed cs (Former Employee)
June 24, 1996 Filing 20 SUMMONS and complaint returned executed: upon defendants Nimrod Q Reynolds, CAA Retirement Plan, Gail Sparks-Ashley, Sandra Stoudenmire, Mary Phillips, Sharon Woods, James H Askew Jr, Clarence E Avery, Jeanette Baxter, Andrew Bowie, Barbara B Boyd, James M Campbell, Irene Cantrell, Lonnie Culpepper, David Dethrage, Robert Downing, James A Dunn, Ada Evans, Lea Fite, Charles Fuller, M Douglas Ghee, Beulah Mae Glasgow, Paul R Goodwin, Johnny Heard, Mildred Heard, J D Hess, Eli Henderson, Richard Hooks, Phillip Jordan, Monroe Lipscomb, Paul Maddox, Ewell Parker, John H Patty, Richard A Powell, Thomas A Pratt, Phillip Pritchett, Robert Rigsby, Johnny Roberts, Melvin Rogers, Mike Rogers, William A Robinson, Leon Smith, Judge Stringer, Rita Stubbs, Sandra Sudduth, Theresa Taylor, Isola Thompson, Horace Thrower, Curtis Vinson, Harold Washington, Alfreda Whatley, Steve Whatley, Lorenzo Williams, Louise Wilson, Jack Wood, Ralph Meade, William Trammel, Nathaniel Davis on various dates beginning 6/1/96 filed (Former Employee)
June 24, 1996 Filing 19 MOTION (12(b)96) by defendant James A Dunn to dismiss filed cs (Former Employee)
June 24, 1996 Filing 18 MOTION (12(b)(6) by defendant Charles Fuller to dismiss filed cs (Former Employee)
June 24, 1996 Filing 17 MOTION (12(b)96) by defendant Phillip Pritchett to dismiss filed (Former Employee)
June 24, 1996 Filing 16 MOTION (12(b)(6) by defendant J D Hess to dismiss filed (Former Employee)
June 24, 1996 Filing 15 MOTION (12(b)(6) by defendant Eli Henderson to dismiss filed (Former Employee)
June 24, 1996 Filing 14 MOTION (12(b)(6) by defendant Robert Downing to dismiss filed (Former Employee)
June 24, 1996 DOCKET modification (utility event) Case reassigned to Judge William M. Acker Jr (Former Employee)
June 21, 1996 Filing 13 MOTION by defendant Nimrod Q Reynolds to dismiss filed cs (CJV)
June 19, 1996 Filing 12 ANSWER by dfts Community Act Agency, Gail Sparks-Ashley, filed on behalf of Sandra Stoudenmire no signature on answer by dft, Mary Phillips, and Sharon Woods filed cs (CJV) Modified on 06/20/1996
June 19, 1996 Filing 11 ANSWER (ltr) by dft Harold Washington filed (CJV)
June 18, 1996 Filing 10 ANSWER by dft William Trammel filed cs (CJV)
June 17, 1996 Filing 9 MOTION (amended) by dft James H Askew Jr to dismiss filed cs (CJV)
June 14, 1996 Filing 6 MOTION (12(b)(6) by defendant Leon Smith to dismiss filed (Former Employee)
June 14, 1996 Filing 7 MOTION 12(b)6) by defendant Horace Thrower to dismiss filed (Former Employee)
June 14, 1996 Filing 8 ANSWER (ltr) by Paul Goodwin regarding summons received for dfts Nimrod Q Reynolds and Community Act Agency filed (CJV)
June 14, 1996 Filing 7 ANSWER by dft Horace Thrower filed cs (CJV)
June 14, 1996 Filing 6 ANSWER by dft Leon Smith filed cs (CJV)
June 14, 1996 Filing 5 MOTION by dft James H Askew Jr to dismiss filed cs (CJV)
June 14, 1996 Filing 4 MOTION by dft Melvin Rogers to dismiss filed cs (CJV)
June 7, 1996 Filing 3 SUMMONS and complaint returned executed: upon defendant Southeastern Emp on 6/5/96 filed (CJV)
June 6, 1996 CERTIFICATE of service filed by plaintiff (CJV)
June 3, 1996 SUMMONS and complaint issued by certified mail as to dft Southern Employees Benefit Services Inc (CJV)
June 3, 1996 Filing 2 REQUEST of plaintiffs for service by certified mail as to dft Southeastern Employees Benefit Services Inc filed (CJV)
June 3, 1996 SUMMONS issued and del to plaintiffs (CJV)
May 31, 1996 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (class action) filed, amt pd $ 120.00, receipt # 200 103275 (CJV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen, et al v. Reynolds, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Nixon
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vergena Richardson
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie C Brockman
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Rouse
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda Wilson
Represented By: Ronald Otto Gaiser, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary A Caver
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Hall
Represented By: Ronald Otto Gaiser, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W Moore
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Thomas
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora Rowland
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lela Chatman
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra K Burns
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A Goodwin
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: bettye Bowie
Represented By: Ronald Otto Gaiser, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marva Words
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnestine Hall
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Frankum
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma G McClellan
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie Johnson
Represented By: Ronald Otto Gaiser, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genene Whisenant
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Perry
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Fincher
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Lee
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred J Russell
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Helen Jackson
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol L Gathright
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henrietta Wright
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Robinson
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Johnson
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Smith
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Allen
Represented By: Ronald Otto Gaiser, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tilda C Wilson
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latanya Garrett
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel M Almon
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinniss Virginia Williams
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula N Atkins
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Smith
Represented By: Ronald Otto Gaiser, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie E Moore
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Lauderdale
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Woods
Represented By: Ronald Otto Gaiser, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie McCallum
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine M West
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Reighard
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ollie Cunningham
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inez T Forbes
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Ann Pitts
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jo Boyd
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Chauncey
Represented By: Ronald Otto Gaiser, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Robinson
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Wah
Represented By: Ronald Otto Gaiser, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Carter
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie L Jones
Represented By: Ronald Otto Gaiser, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Easley
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth S Mims
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gisela Morris-Jones
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Wilkinson
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Germaine Thomas
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie James
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Birdie D Hutchings
Represented By: Thomas M Semmes
Represented By: Sara C Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rigsby
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beulah Mae Glasgow
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Represented By: Robert L Humphries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isola Thompson
Represented By: Charles G Spradling, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Employees Benefit Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harville & Co PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Trammel
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Sudduth
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Meade
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Maddox
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Sparks-Ashley
Represented By: James S Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorenzo Williams
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Reich
Represented By: Paul C Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Downing
Represented By: Thomas M Sowa
Represented By: Polly Enger Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Cantrell
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Vinson
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Douglas Ghee
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M Campbell
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada Evans
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nimrod Q Reynolds
Represented By: Richard P Rouco
Represented By: Samuel H Heldman
Represented By: Donald V Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe Lipscomb
Represented By: Craig S Dillard
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Rogers
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J D Hess
Represented By: Thomas M Sowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Stubbs
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfreda Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gambrell Associates Inc &
Represented By: Thomas J Skinner, IV
Represented By: Catherine L Hogewood
Represented By: Laura Catherine Nettles
Represented By: J Allen Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Gambrell
Represented By: Thomas J Skinner, IV
Represented By: Catherine L Hogewood
Represented By: Laura Catherine Nettles
Represented By: J Allen Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie Culpepper
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horace Thrower
Represented By: John R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Wright
Represented By: Burgin H Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise Wilson
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney J Griggs
Represented By: Thomas J Skinner, IV
Represented By: Laura Catherine Nettles
Represented By: J Allen Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Action Agency Calhoun Cleburne Cherokee Counties Inc of and
Represented By: Bruce N Adams
Represented By: Cleophus Thomas, Jr
Represented By: Charles H Rice
Represented By: Donald W Stewart
Represented By: P Camille Lamar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence E Avery
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hooks
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Frances Phillips
Represented By: Thomas W Harmon
Represented By: Mary Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Household Insurance Company
Represented By: John M Johnson
Represented By: John Q Somerville
Represented By: Andrew J Noble, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Rogers
Represented By: John R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Stoudenmire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Fuller
Represented By: Connie Ray Stockham
Represented By: Thomas M Sowa
Represented By: Jim H Wilson
Represented By: Allison O Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dethrage
Represented By: Frederic A Ransom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara B Boyd
Represented By: James W McGlaughn
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Represented By: F Michael Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Roberts
Represented By: John M Fraley
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAA Retirement Plan
Represented By: Bruce N Adams
Represented By: Cleophus Thomas, Jr
Represented By: Charles H Rice
Represented By: Donald W Stewart
Represented By: Phillip G Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A Dunn
Represented By: Thomas M Sowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Jordan
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Hamilton Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: John M Johnson
Represented By: John Q Somerville
Represented By: Sara Anne Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A Robinson
Represented By: Frederic A Ransom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H Askew, Jr
Represented By: John R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A Pratt
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H Patty
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Whatley
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lea Fite
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Stringer
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Smith
Represented By: John R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mildred Heard
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Bowie
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Davis
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ewell Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Henderson
Represented By: Thomas M Sowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul R Goodwin
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Pritchett
Represented By: Thomas M Sowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A Powell
Represented By: Christopher M Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?