Billingsley v. Orr

Plaintiff: Kristopher Billingsley
Defendant: Willie Orr
Case Number: 1:2013cv01337
Filed: July 18, 2013
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Eastern Office
County: Talladega
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 36 Second MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 4/7/2015. (JLC)
March 9, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 28 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct 26 Memorandum Opinion and Order, MOTION to Vacate as set out herein. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 3/9/2015. (JLC)
January 13, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment as set out herein. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 1/13/2015. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billingsley v. Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Billingsley
Represented By: Kenneth E Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?