The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Boyd et al

Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Frederick L Boyd and F.B.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01110
Filed: June 11, 2014
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Eastern Office
County: Calhoun
Presiding Judge: Harwell G Davis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 19 First MOTION for Disbursement of Funds. The proceeds from Cormella Boyd's life insurance policy, $548,556.14, plus interest, are therefore to be distributed to Frederick Montez Boyd, the altern ate beneficiary under Cormella Boyd's life insurance policy upon application by Frederick Montez Boyd to the Clerk of Court for distribution of the funds interpleaded in this case, however, no such distribution shall occur before the time to file a Notice of Appeal of this Order has expired without such notice having been filed. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 3/2/2016. (JLC)
September 16, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER -re: R&R 30 . The court hereby ADOPTS the report of the magistrate judge and ACCEPTS the recommendations. It is ORDERED that this court will hold an evidentiary hearing, on a date after six months from the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 9/16/2015. (AVC)
January 5, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT UNDER RULE 54(B)-re: 17 Report and Recommendation. The court hereby ADOPTS the report and ACCEPTS IN PART the recommendations of the magistrate judge. It is ORDERED that the motion of Prudential is GRANTED, except to the extent that it requests injunctive relief against the Dfts. Any and all claims against Prudential relative to the Group Policy and/or the Death Benefit are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and Prudential is DISMISSED from this litigation. The parties are hereby REALIGNED with Frederick L. Boyd as pltf and, F.B., a minor, by and through his guardian in fact, Charity Teague, as dft. This Court RETAINS jurisdiction over the Dfts, who are compelledto litigate, adjust and/or settle among each other their respective and lawfulentitlement to the Death Benefit, or upon their failure to do so, this Court shall settle and adjust the claims and determine to whom the total funds shall be paid. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 1/5/2015. (AVC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Boyd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Tenley E Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick L Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?