Griffin v. Calhoun County Jail et al
Plaintiff: James E Griffin
Defendant: Calhoun County Jail and Eric Star
Case Number: 1:2018cv01199
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Eastern Office
County: Calhoun
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Order re #7 . (TLM, )
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER terming motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is required to pay a partial filing fee in the amount of $13.33, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 9/17/2018. (TLM, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE to 9/5/2018 Order re #5 filed by Calhoun County Jail. (TLM, )
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER For good cause shown, the plaintiffs motion to compel jail officials to complete his jail account statement is GRANTED. The undersigned ORDERS defendant Jail Administrator Eric Star to provide the court with a copy of the plaintiffs jail account statements for the last six months. A certification page is attached for this purpose. To the extent the plaintiff has not been incarcerated in the jail for at least six months, the undersigned ORDERS defendant Star to certify the plaintiffs jail account statement for the period of time he has been incarcerated there. Defendant Star shall have fifteen (15) days from the entry date of this Order to provide the account statements and certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 9/15/2018. (TLM, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel by James E Griffin. (KEK)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Notice of Deficient pleading the plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis is deficient for the reasons indicated below. The plaintiff must correct the deficient pleading within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 8/2/2018. (TLM, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James E Griffin. (TLM, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Calhoun County Jail, Eric Star, filed by James E Griffin.(TLM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Calhoun County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calhoun County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Star
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?