002152706 Ontario Limited et al v. Changer & Dresser Corp.
Plaintiff: 002152706 Ontario Limited and JEC Distributors Inc
Defendant: Changer & Dresser Inc and Changer & Dresser Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01228
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 131 NOTICE by 002152706 Ontario Limited Notice of Supplemental Authority from Related Case Relating to Defendant's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 59-60 and 101) and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Substitute Real Party in Interest (Doc. 103) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Adopting R&R, #2 Exhibit B - Report and Recommendations)(Kuehnert, Joel)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS the motions for limited admission of attorneys Corbett and Kauget #125 , #126 . Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/21/18. (SAC )
September 20, 2018 Filing 129 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. Judge Abdul K Kallon no longer assigned to the case. (AFS)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Mooting #65 MOTION to Substitute Party in Interest and to Stay Proceedings in Separate Action, #71 MOTION to Dismiss, or Alternatively Transfer, for Improper Venue, and #90 Joint MOTION for Hearing; granting #123 MOTION to Reassign Case/Transfer Action To The Eastern Division Of This Court. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 9/20/2018. (AFS)
September 19, 2018 Filing 127 Notice of Reassignment- Because all parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 2:18-cv-1228-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. (MRR, )
September 14, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3173588 (B4601092047). (Dolive, Devin) Modified on 9/17/2018 (MRR, ).
September 14, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3173583 (B4601092046). (Dolive, Devin) Modified on 9/17/2018 (MRR, ).
September 14, 2018 Filing 126 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ryan M. Corbett Motion is RIPE 9/14/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Changer & Dresser Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit of Corbett)(Dolive, Devin)
September 14, 2018 Filing 125 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Harvey S. Kauget Motion is RIPE 9/14/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Changer & Dresser Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit of Kauget)(Dolive, Devin) Modified docket text to include PHV attorney's name on 9/17/2018 (MRR, ).
September 6, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3167193 (B4601091795). (Berchou, Michael) Modified on 9/7/2018 (MRR, ).
September 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/5/2018. (ASL)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 TEXT ORDER granting #122 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice, contingent upon payment of the fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/4/2018. (PMA)
August 24, 2018 Filing 123 MOTION to Reassign Case /Transfer Action To The Eastern Division Of This Court by Changer & Dresser Inc. (Dolive, Devin)
August 21, 2018 Filing 122 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Berchou Motion is RIPE 8/21/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kuehnert, Joel)
August 14, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel M Kuehnert on behalf of 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc (Kuehnert, Joel)
August 10, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Devin Clarke Dolive on behalf of Changer & Dresser Inc (Dolive, Devin)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than September 17, 2018. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after September 17, 2018. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 a.m. on September 5, 2018. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/8/18. (MRR, )
August 7, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 117 Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 1:15-cv-00020. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 19, 2018 Filing 116 DECISION AND ORDER. Defendant's alternative motion to transfer (Dkt. 101) is GRANTED; Defendant's motion to dismiss for improper venue (Dkt. 101) is DISMISSED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to take all steps necessary to transfer this matter to the Northern District of Alabama. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 7/19/2018. (SDW)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 115 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #114 Notice (Other), Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority Relating to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Changer & Dresser Corp., Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc. re #101 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint (NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY) (Attachments: #1 Report and Recommendations Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
April 4, 2018 Filing 113 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #112 Reply/Response (PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY) filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 112 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #111 Notice (Other), of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Authority Relating to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc. re #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #101 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Canadian Federal Court Judgment), #2 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
February 2, 2018 Filing 110 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #103 Cross MOTION to Substitute Party in Interest as Plaintiff filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 26, 2018 Filing 109 RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 Cross MOTION to Substitute Party in Interest as Plaintiff filed by Changer & Dresser Corp., Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 19, 2018 Filing 108 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #105 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Changer & Dresser Corp., Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 8, 2018 Filing 107 TEXT ORDER re #101 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Changer & Dresser, Inc. Replies due by 1/19/2018. Cross MOTION to Substitute Party in Interest as Plaintiff [103[ filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc. Responses due by 1/26/2018. Replies due 2/2/2018. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 1/8/2018. (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 5, 2018 Filing 106 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc. re #103 Cross MOTION to Substitute Party in Interest as Plaintiff, #105 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #104 Declaration,, (Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 5, 2018 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #101 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint and in Support of Cross-Motion to Substitute Real Party in Interest as Plaintiff filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 5, 2018 Filing 104 DECLARATION signed by Giuseppe Ruggiero re #101 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint, #103 Cross MOTION to Substitute Party in Interest as Plaintiff filed by JEC Distributors Inc., 002152706 Ontario Limited filed by JEC Distributors Inc., 002152706 Ontario Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 5, 2018 Filing 103 Cross MOTION to Substitute Party in Interest as Plaintiff by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc..(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
December 13, 2017 Filing 102 TEXT ORDER re #101 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Changer & Dresser, Inc. Responses due by 1/5/2018. Replies due by 1/19/2018. Oral argument at the discretion of the court. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 12/13/2017. (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
December 11, 2017 Filing 101 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint by Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration of Ryan M. Corbett, Esq. in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)(Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
November 27, 2017 Filing 100 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIFTH) against Changer & Dresser, Inc., filed by JEC Distributors Inc., 002152706 Ontario Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
November 20, 2017 E-Filing Notification: #99 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in support of #71 MOTION to Dismiss, by Changer & Dresser, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Corbett, Ryan). Entry has been modified on 11/20/2017 to correct title (KLH). [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
November 17, 2017 Filing 99 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in support of #71 MOTION to Dismiss, by Changer & Dresser, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Corbett, Ryan) Modified on 11/20/2017 to correct title (KLH). [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 98 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Leslie G. Foschio, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 11/15/2017. (MEAL) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 97 DECISION AND ORDER granting #91 Motion to Amend or Correct. Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/13/2017. (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
October 2, 2017 Filing 96 RESPONSE in Support re #91 MOTION to Amend/Correct #54 Amended Complaint filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 95 AFFIDAVIT of Ryan M. Corbett in Support of Defendant's in Opposition re #91 MOTION to Amend/Correct #54 Amended Complaint to Add Newly Issued Patent No. 9,757,814 filed by Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re #91 MOTION to Amend/Correct #54 Amended Complaint to Add Newly Issued Patent No. 9,757,814 filed by Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 93 AMENDED TEXT ORDER re #91 MOTION to Amend/Correct #54 Amended Complaint filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc. Responses due by 9/26/2017. Replies due by 10/2/2017. Oral argument at the discretion of the court. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/19/2017. (TAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 92 TEXT ORDER re #91 MOTION to Amend/Correct #54 Amended Complaint filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc. Responses due by 9/25/2017. Replies due by 9/29/2017. Oral argument at the discretion of the court. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/18/2017. (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 91 MOTION to Amend/Correct #54 Amended Complaint by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Michael J. Berchou, #3 Exhibit A ('814 patent), #4 Exhibit B (Infringement Chart), #5 Exhibit C (Proposed Amended Complaint), #6 Exhibit D (Redline Version of Proposed Amended Complaint), #7 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
August 30, 2017 Filing 90 Joint MOTION for Hearing (Jointly Proposed Dates for Claim Construction Hearing Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4.7) by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 89 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #88 Reply/Response, filed by Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
August 3, 2017 Filing 88 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #83 Reply/Response Plaintiffs' Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Michael J. Berchou, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
August 2, 2017 Filing 87 FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.)Please see attached document for dates regarding discovery and claim construction.. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 8/2/2017. (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
July 31, 2017 E-Filing Notification: #70 Main Document 70 replaced on 7/31/2017) (Docket Entry modified 7/31/2017). Renamed the Scheduling Order as the THIRD Scheduling Order so as to correct the sequence of amendments. (SDW). (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
July 31, 2017 Filing 86 TEXT ORDER granting #85 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Fourth Amended Scheduling Order shall be filed separately. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 7/31/2017. (SDW) Modified on 7/31/2017 to correct the sequence of amendments) (SDW). [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
July 27, 2017 Filing 85 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefs by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
July 14, 2017 Filing 84 AFFIDAVIT re #83 Reply/Response by Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
July 14, 2017 Filing 83 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #78 Memorandum/Brief, filed by Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
July 7, 2017 Filing 82 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #81 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively Transfer, for Improper Venue filed by Changer & Dresser Corp., Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #71 MOTION to Dismiss , or Alternatively Transfer, for Improper Venue filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
June 19, 2017 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc. re #79 Declaration, #78 Memorandum/Brief, (Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
June 19, 2017 Filing 79 DECLARATION re #78 Memorandum/Brief, filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
June 19, 2017 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF Plaintiffs' Opening Claim Construction Brief by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 ('281 patent), #2 Exhibit 2 ('609 patent), #3 Exhibit 3 ('639 patent))(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
June 15, 2017 Filing 77 TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, the #76 Joint Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule on #71 Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively Transfer is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' response is now due 6/30/2017. Defendant's reply is now due 7/7/2017. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 6/15/2017. (MEAL) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 76 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #71 MOTION to Dismiss , or Alternatively Transfer, for Improper Venue, 74 Order, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation & Joint Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule, #2 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
June 12, 2017 Filing 75 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 74 CORRECTED SCHEDULING NOTICE on Defendant's #71 Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively Transfer, for Improper Venue. Response due by 6/20/2017. Reply due by 6/27/2017. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court as necessary. (MEAL) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 73 SCHEDULING NOTICE on Defendant's #71 Motion to Dismiss , or Alternatively Transfer, for Improper Venue. Response due by 6/20/2017. Reply due by 6/21/2017. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court as necessary. (MEAL) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
June 6, 2017 Filing 72 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Changer & Dresser, Inc.. to #71 MOTION to Dismiss , or Alternatively Transfer, for Improper Venue Kevin Third Affidavit filed by Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
June 6, 2017 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss , or Alternatively Transfer, for Improper Venue by Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
May 2, 2017 Filing 70 THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Please see attached document for dates regarding discovery and claim construction. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/2/2017. (SDW) (Main Document 70 replaced on 7/31/2017) (Docket Entry modified 7/31/2017) (SDW). [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
May 1, 2017 Filing 69 TEXT ORDER granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Second Amended Scheduling Order shall be filed separately. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/1/2017. (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
April 27, 2017 Filing 68 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 5, 2017 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #65 MOTION to Substitute Party in Interest and to Stay Proceedings in Separate Action and REPLY re #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
December 22, 2016 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc. re #65 MOTION to Substitute Party in Interest and to Stay Proceedings in Separate Action (Altieri, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
December 22, 2016 Filing 65 MOTION to Substitute Party in Interest and to Stay Proceedings in Separate Action by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law Opposing Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Their Cross-Motion to Substitute Real Party-in-Interest and Stay Proceedings in Separate Action, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Berchou, #3 Exhibit Berchou Decl. Ex. A, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Giuseppe Ruggerio, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H)(Altieri, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 64 TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, the Joint #63 Motion to Modify the Briefing Schedule is granted. Plaintiff's response to the #59 Motion to Dismiss is now due 12/22/2016. Defendant's reply is now due 1/5/2017. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 12/15/2016. (MEAL) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
December 14, 2016 Filing 63 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 62 Order, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation and Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order)(Altieri, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
December 13, 2016 Filing 62 SCHEDULING NOTICE on Defendant's #59 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 12/15/2016. Reply due by 12/22/2016. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court as necessary. (MEAL) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
December 1, 2016 Filing 61 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Please see attached document for dates regarding discovery and claim construction. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 12/1/2016. (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
December 1, 2016 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Support re #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ryan M. Corbett In Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction)(Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
December 1, 2016 Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Changer & Dresser, Inc..(Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
December 1, 2016 Filing 58 TEXT ORDER granting #57 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Second Amended Scheduling Order shall be filed separately. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 12/1/2016. (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
November 29, 2016 Filing 57 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Contentions and Claim Construction Papers Under Local Patent Rules by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
November 17, 2016 Filing 56 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #55 Answer to Amended Complaint (ANSWER to #55 Answer to Fourth Amended Complaint and Counterclaims) filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
November 14, 2016 Filing 55 ANSWER to #54 Amended Complaint and Counterclaim by Changer & Dresser, Inc..(Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Fourth) against Changer & Dresser, Inc., filed by JEC Distributors Inc., 002152706 Ontario Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service COS)(Altieri, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
October 31, 2016 Filing 53 DECISION and ORDER granting #49 Motion to Amend or Correct. Plaintiffs shall file a Fourth Amended Complaint as proposed by Plaintiffs within 30 days of this Decision and Order. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/31/2016. (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
October 21, 2016 Filing 52 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #49 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Reply Declaration of Michael Berchou in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint)(Altieri, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
October 14, 2016 E-Filing Notification: Title has been corrected to reflect Defendant's response in opposition to Plaintiff's motion #51 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #49 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Corbett, Ryan) Modified on 10/14/2016 to correct title (KLH). (KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
October 14, 2016 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #49 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Corbett, Ryan) Modified on 10/14/2016 to correct title (KLH). [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re #49 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc. Responses due by 10/14/2016. Replies due by 10/21/2016. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/29/2016. (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
September 27, 2016 Filing 49 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of their Motion to Amend the Complaint, dated September 27, 2016, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Berchou, dated September 27, 2016, #3 Exhibit Ex. A to Berchou Decl., #4 Exhibit Ex. B to Berchou Decl., #5 Exhibit Ex. C to Berchou Decl.)(Altieri, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
August 30, 2016 Filing 48 FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.)Please see attached document for dates regarding discovery and claim construction. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 8/30/2016. (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
August 30, 2016 Filing 47 TEXT ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. First Amended Scheduling Order shall be filed separately. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 8/30/2016. (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
August 29, 2016 Filing 46 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
May 11, 2016 Filing 45 Mediation Certification by Heidi S. Martinez(Martinez, Heidi) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
May 11, 2016 Filing 44 Mediation Certification by Heidi S. Martinez(Martinez, Heidi) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
March 24, 2016 Filing 43 Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
March 7, 2016 Filing 42 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 3/7/2016. (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 41 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Stipulated Protective Order), #2 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Mandatory Disclosures due by 3/2/2016. Stipulation of Selection of Mediator due by 3/25/2016. Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 4/29/2016. First Mediation Session due by 5/10/2016. Please see attached document for further dates regarding Discovery and Claim Construction. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 2/25/2016. (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
February 25, 2016 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Scheduling Conference held on 2/25/2016. Case management order discussed, same to be filed by the court. Appearances: Pltf: Michael Berchou, Esq., Dft: Harvey Kauget, Esq. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
February 9, 2016 Filing 38 TEXT ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2016 11:00 AM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio; adjourned from 2/24/2016 at the request of court. Out-of-town counsel may appear by telephone, please provide the court with contact information. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 2/9/2016. (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
February 8, 2016 Filing 37 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 21, 2016 Filing 36 ANSWER to #33 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2016 11:00 AM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 1/12/2016. (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 12, 2016 Filing 34 TEXT ORDER granting #30 Motion. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 1/12/2016. (SDW) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 8, 2016 Filing 33 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Changer & Dresser Corp., Changer & Dresser, Inc..(Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 6, 2016 Filing 32 TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, the Consent Motion to Extend Time to Serve Answer to Third Amended Complaint and Counterclaim is GRANTED. Time is extended to and including 1/11/2016. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 1/6/2016. (MEAL) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 6, 2016 Filing 31 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER - Hon. Leslie G. Foschio, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by United States District Judge William M. Skretny on 1/6/2016. (JCD) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 5, 2016 Filing 30 MOTION Set Date for Initial Scheduling Conference by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 4, 2016 Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #28 Amended Complaint by Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer and Counterclaim to Third Amended Complaint)(Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
December 7, 2015 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Third Amended Complaint) against Changer & Dresser, Inc., filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
December 7, 2015 Filing 27 STIPULATION & Consent to Amend Complaint by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Third Amended Complaint), #2 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 26 TEXT ORDER In light of Defendant's assertion that the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office has issued a decision denying institution of inter partes review, the pendency of which formed the basis for its motion to stay the present proceedings, Defendant's motion to withdraw #25 is GRANTED and the prior motion to stay #15 is dismissed as moot. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 11/19/2015. (MEAL) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
October 21, 2015 E-Filing Notification: Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use (Motion to withdrawal) event. No action required re #25 NOTICE by Changer & Dresser, Inc. re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Stay (Dkt. No. 15) (Corbett, Ryan) (DLC) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
October 20, 2015 Filing 25 MOTION TO WITHDRAW by Changer & Dresser, Inc. re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Stay (Dkt. No. 15) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ryan M. Corbett In Support of Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Stay)(Corbett, Ryan) Title of document changed on docket. Modified on 10/21/2015 (DLC). [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
June 15, 2015 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C to reply ISO Motion to Stay)(Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
June 4, 2015 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Opposition to Motion to Stay, #2 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
June 4, 2015 Filing 22 Corrected ANSWER to #14 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
June 4, 2015 Filing 21 ANSWER to #14 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
May 28, 2015 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, Plaintiffs' #18 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Answer to Counterclaims is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' answer is now due 6/4/2015. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Senior United States District Judge on 5/27/2015. (CMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
May 27, 2015 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
May 26, 2015 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
May 14, 2015 Filing 17 SCHEDULING NOTICE on #15 Motion to Stay. Response due by 5/28/2015. Reply due by 6/8/2015. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court as necessary. (MEAL) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
May 11, 2015 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review byChanger & Dresser, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ryan M. Corbett In Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Affidavit of Kevin Third In Support of Motion to Stay)(Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
May 11, 2015 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review by Changer & Dresser, Inc..(Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
May 5, 2015 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution (DLC) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
May 4, 2015 Filing 14 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Changer & Dresser, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kaeseler '170 Application, #2 Exhibit B - DE 199 05 477 (Koch), #3 Exhibit C - Translation of DE 199 05 477 (Koch), #4 Exhibit D - November 19, 2012 Information Disclosure Statement)(Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
April 21, 2015 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER. The #11 Stipulation and Consent to amend Plaintiffs' complaint is HEREBY SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Senior United States District Judge on 4/20/2015. (CMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
April 17, 2015 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against Changer & Dresser, Inc., filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
April 17, 2015 Filing 11 STIPULATION & Consent to File Second Amended Complaint by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Second Amended Complaint), #2 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
April 1, 2015 Filing 10 SCHEDULING NOTICE on Defendant's #8 Partial Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 4/17/2015. Reply due by 4/27/2015. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court as necessary. (MEAL) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
March 31, 2015 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM byChanger & Dresser, Inc.. (Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
March 31, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Changer & Dresser, Inc..(Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
March 31, 2015 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Changer & Dresser, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kyokutoh Co., Ltd. for Changer & Dresser, Inc... (Corbett, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
February 11, 2015 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. Changer & Dresser, Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2015, answer due 3/31/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
February 10, 2015 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Changer & Dresser, Inc., filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Patent No. 8,742,281))(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 27, 2015 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. Changer & Dresser Corp. served on 1/20/2015, answer due 2/10/2015. (Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 12, 2015 Remark ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 7, 2015 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Changer & Dresser Corp.. (DLC) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 7, 2015 Report on the Filing or Determination of Patent or Trademark Case sent to USPTO. (DLC) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 7, 2015 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution (DLC) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 7, 2015 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/AO085.pdf (DLC) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 7, 2015 Case Assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. (DLC) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 6, 2015 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]
January 6, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Changer & Dresser Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-2176175.), filed by 002152706 Ontario Limited, JEC Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Berchou, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/3/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 002152706 Ontario Limited et al v. Changer & Dresser Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Changer & Dresser Inc
Represented By: Harvey Kauget
Represented By: Ryan Corbett
Represented By: Devin Clarke Dolive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Changer & Dresser Corp.
Represented By: Ryan Corbett
Represented By: Devin Clarke Dolive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 002152706 Ontario Limited
Represented By: Lauren Renee Mendolera
Represented By: Daniel James Altieri
Represented By: Michael James Berchou
Represented By: Joel M Kuehnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEC Distributors Inc
Represented By: Lauren Renee Mendolera
Represented By: Daniel James Altieri
Represented By: Michael James Berchou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?