Spears v. KMG Enterprises Inc

Plaintiff: Deandra Spears
Defendant: KMG Enterprises Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv01548
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Deandra Spears. (Brooks, Hycall)
October 25, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by November 16, 2018. Replies due by November 30, 2018. (JLC)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Defendant has filed a motion to dismiss Plaintiff's amended complaint. (Doc. 9). Plaintiff shall file its response to the motion to dismiss on or before November 16, 2018. Defendant's reply, if necessary, is due on or before November 30, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/25/2018. (MCP)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by KMG Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tyra, Bryan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against KMG Enterprises Inc, filed by Deandra Spears.(Brooks, Hycall)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The court has granted Plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint. (Doc. 6). The amended complaint will become the operative pleading, and so the court DENIES as MOOT Defendant's #3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/12/2018.(MCP)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff SHALL FILE the amended complaint as a separate docket entry. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/12/2018.(MCP)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Deandra Spears. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Brooks, Hycall)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Deandra Spears. (Brooks, Hycall)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by KMG Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tyra, Bryan)
September 24, 2018 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, receipt number B4601092193. (JLC)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Deandra Spears. (KEK)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KMG Enterprises Inc, filed by Deandra Spears.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spears v. KMG Enterprises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMG Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Bryan Scott Tyra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deandra Spears
Represented By: Hycall Brooks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?