Jennings v. Patterson et al

Defendant: Patterson and Attorney General of the State of ALabama
Petitioner: Willie Jennings
Case Number: 1:2019cv00045
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER To avoid further confusion, Mr. Jennings is ORDERED to affix theappropriate case number to the first page of any future filings. Pleadings Mr. Jennings intends to file in the habeas case SHALL bear the case number 1:19-cv- 00045-ACA-SGC. Pleadings Mr. Jennings intends to file in the 1983 case SHALL bear the case number 1:18-cv-01950-RDP-SGC. Mr. Jennings is ADVISED that future court orders will only be entered in the appropriate case and will bear the applicable case number.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/26/2019. (TLM, ) Modified on 2/27/2019 (TLM, ).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Notice of Deficient Pleading The petition in this matter is deficient The petitioner is ORDERED to correct the deficient pleading within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/11/2019. (TLM, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Willie Jennings. (TLM, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Willie Jennings.(TLM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings v. Patterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the State of ALabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willie Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?