Vasser et al v. Leesburg, Town of et al

Plaintiff: Billy Joe Vasser and Vicki Vasser
Defendant: Brian Gilliland, Kaleb Howard Hamilton, Marcy Foster, Leesburg, Town of, Jeanne Gay Nichols and Josh Summerford
Case Number: 1:2019cv00098
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Billy Joe Vasser, Vicki Vasser. Brian Gilliland waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/4/2019. (Piazza, Anthony)
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Billy Joe Vasser, Vicki Vasser. Leesburg, Town of waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/4/2019. (Piazza, Anthony)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 3/11/19. (SAC )
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Brian Gilliland, Leesburg, Town of.(Howard, Howard)
January 18, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601094843 (TLM, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marcy Foster, Brian Gilliland, Kaleb Howard Hamilton, Leesburg, Town of, Jeanne Gay Nichols, Josh Summerford, filed by Billy Joe Vasser, Vicki Vasser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC) Modified on 1/17/2019 (KEK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasser et al v. Leesburg, Town of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Joe Vasser
Represented By: Anthony J Piazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Vasser
Represented By: Anthony J Piazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Gilliland
Represented By: Howard Edgar Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaleb Howard Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcy Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leesburg, Town of
Represented By: Howard Edgar Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Gay Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Summerford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?