Seals v. Sylacauga City School Board
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Seals
Defendant: Sylacauga City School Board
Case Number: 1:2019cv00156
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nathaniel Seals. (Dortch, Clarence)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER setting briefing schedule re #3 MOTION to Dismiss - Plaintiff's response is due on or before March 27, 2019. A reply, if any, is due on or before April 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 3/13/19. (SAC )
March 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Sylacauga City School Board. (Johnson, Carl)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sylacauga City School Board; returned to pla for service. (KWC)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sylacauga City School Board (Filing fee received 1/30/2019 from Dortch Law Offices LLC in the amount of $400.00, USDC receipt number B4601094998), filed by Nathaniel Seals. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seals v. Sylacauga City School Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Seals
Represented By: Clarence Dortch, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylacauga City School Board
Represented By: Carl E Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?