Bentley et al v. Townsend Tree Service Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Xavier Rasberry and Mark Bentley
Defendant: Townsend Tree Service Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00211
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 3/21/19. (SAC )
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Townsend Tree Service Company, LLC.(Harrison, Josh)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint. Townsend Tree Service Company, LLC must file its responsive pleading on or before March 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 3/5/2019. (RLW)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Townsend Tree Service Company, LLC. (Harrison, Josh)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Townsend Tree Service Company, LLC. filed by Townsend Tree Service Company, LLC (Harrison, Josh)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Bentley, Xavier Rasberry. Townsend Tree Service Company, LLC served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (TLM, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Townsend Tree Service Company, LLC. mailed certified mail (TLM, )
February 6, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601095207. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Townsend Tree Service Company, LLC, filed by Mark Bentley, Xavier Rasberry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC). (Arnold, Allen) Modified on 2/7/2019 (TLM, ).
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 Request for service by certified mail filed by Mark Bentley, Xavier Rasberry. (KWC)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Xavier Rasberry. (KWC)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Mark Bentley. (KWC)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Townsend Tree Service Company, LLC, filed by Mark Bentley, Xavier Rasberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bentley et al v. Townsend Tree Service Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Rasberry
Represented By: Allen Durham Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bentley
Represented By: Allen Durham Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Townsend Tree Service Company, LLC
Represented By: Josh C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?