United States of America v. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Currency
Claimant: Omar Vann
Case Number: 1:2019cv00267
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 CLAIM Amended Verified Claim by Omar Vann. (Rankin, Rolando)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 5/16/2019 unless they unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 4/30/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 4/30/2019, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 4/4/2019. (KAM)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 CLAIM Verified Claim by Omar Vann. (Rankin, Rolando)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rolando Demond Rankin on behalf of Omar Vann (Rankin, Rolando)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Omar Vann, c/o Rolando Rankin, Esq. (Borton, Thomas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Omar Vann (Borton, Thomas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Nicolas Parchman (Borton, Thomas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Chauncee Alexander (Borton, Thomas)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 WARRANT of for Arrest and Notice issued delivered to USA (KAM)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Currency, filed by United States of America.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas E Borton, IV
Represented By: Jay E Town
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Omar Vann
Represented By: Rolando Demond Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?