Buse et al v. Camping World Property Inc
Plaintiff: Jason Buse and Dustin Stallings
Defendant: Camping World Property Inc and Freedom Roads LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00278
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading on or before April 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 3/15/2019. (KMG)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney L Calhoun on behalf of Camping World Property Inc, Freedom Roads LLC (Calhoun, Courtney)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Camping World Property Inc, Freedom Roads LLC. (Calhoun, Courtney)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Stallings, Jason Buse. Camping World Property Inc served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019; Freedom Roads LLC served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (TLM, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Camping World Property Inc, Freedom Roads LLC. mailed certified mail (TLM, )
February 19, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601095490 related document #1 COMPLAINT against Camping World Property Inc, filed by Dustin Stallings, Jason Buse.(TLM, ) Modified on 2/15/2019 (TLM, ).. (Farris, Kirby) Modified on 2/19/2019 (TLM, ).
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Jason Buse, Dustin Stallings. (TLM, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Camping World Property Inc, filed by Dustin Stallings, Jason Buse.(TLM, ) Modified on 2/15/2019 (TLM, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buse et al v. Camping World Property Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Buse
Represented By: Kirby D Farris
Represented By: Meredith Kay Maitrejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Stallings
Represented By: Kirby D Farris
Represented By: Meredith Kay Maitrejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camping World Property Inc
Represented By: Jennifer F Swain
Represented By: Courtney C Morman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Roads LLC
Represented By: Jennifer F Swain
Represented By: Courtney C Morman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?