Carter v. American Strategic Insurance Corporation

Plaintiff: Stephanie Carter
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00597
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER This Court acknowledges receipt of the parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice #4 filed on May 28, 2019. The motion #4 is GRANTED. Accordingly, the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/31/2019. (PSM)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by American Strategic Insurance Corporation. (Masterson, Kevin)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by American Strategic Insurance Corporation.(Masterson, Kevin)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS- with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/19/2019. (PSM)
April 19, 2019 Filing Fee received from Kevin F Masterson in the amount of $400.00, credit card receipt_number 1126-3327375; USDC receipt number B4601096939; related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Strategic Insurance Corporation from Circuit Court Talladega County, Alabama, case number CV-2019-900145, filed by American Strategic Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC). (Masterson, Kevin) Modified on 4/19/2019 (KWC)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Strategic Insurance Corporation from Circuit Court Talladega County, Alabama, case number CV-2019-900145, filed by American Strategic Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Kevin F Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Carter
Represented By: Matthew J Meloun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?