Vickers v. Calhoun County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Eric Squire Vickers
Defendant: Matthew Wade and Calhoun County Jail
Case Number: 1:2019cv00640
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The court instructed the plaintiff that he must file corrected pleadings within thirty (30) days and that the failure to comply could result in the dismissal of this action. (Id.). That time has elapsed and the plaintiff has not complied with or otherwise responded to the Order of May 2, 2019. Accordingly, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to the plaintiffs failure to prosecute. Objections to R&R due by 6/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/12/2019. (KEK)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Because the plaintiff was not incarcerated at the time this action was filed, the requirements of the Prison Litigation Reform Act of 1995 (PLRA), codified in part at 28 U.S.C. 1915(e), 1915A, and 42 U.S.C. 1997e, do not apply to him. The court therefore ORDERS that the plaintiff shall re-file his application to proceed in forma pauperis and complaint utilizing forms not intended for prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/2/2019. (KEK)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Squire Vickers. (KEK)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Calhoun County Jail, Matthew Wade, filed by Eric Squire Vickers.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vickers v. Calhoun County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Squire Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calhoun County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?