Thomas v. Road & Rail Services (MAG+)

Plaintiff: Nachica M. Thomas
Defendant: Road & Rail Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv00760
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Eastern Office
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:18-cv-01064. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 20, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/20/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION AND ORDER: 1) ADOPTING the #8 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge; 2) this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama; 3) the #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is left pending for the transferee court; DIRECTING the clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer; this case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/20/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/20/2019.]
April 25, 2019 No objections filed to the #8 Recommendation. (NO PDF attached to this entry). (am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/20/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a); Objections to R&R due by 4/23/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 4/9/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/20/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of the pro se party to Participate in the Pro Se Assistance Program by Nachica M. Thomas. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/20/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 INFORMATION of the pro se party For Participation in the Pro Se Assistance Program by Nachica M. Thomas. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/20/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Nachica M. Thomas re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/20/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to Magistrate Judge Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/2/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/20/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Nachica M. Thomas; Corporate Disclosures due by 1/7/2019; copy mailed to plf with form. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/20/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nachica M. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/20/2019.]
December 21, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Nachica M. Thomas. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/20/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Road & Rail Services, filed by Nachica M. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Road & Rail Services (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Road & Rail Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nachica M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?