Davis Product Creation and Consulting, LLC v. Blazer
Plaintiff: Davis Product Creation and Consulting, LLC
Defendant: Brian Blazer
Case Number: 1:2019cv00848
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Davis Product Creation and Consulting, LLC. Brian Blazer waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Burgess, C)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brian Blazer, filed by Davis Product Creation and Consulting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Burgess, C)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy A Smith on behalf of Davis Product Creation and Consulting, LLC (Smith, Jeremy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Judge Corey L Maze from the Unassigned Judge A civil cases (SRD)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brian Blazer d/b/a Carpenter Bee Solutions, returned to Plaintiff's attorney for service on this the 5th day of June, 2019. (JLC)
June 5, 2019 Filing Fee received from C Gregory Burgess in the amount of $400.00, credit card receipt_number 1126-3362067; USDC receipt number B4601098209; related document #1 COMPLAINT against Brian Blazer, filed by Davis Product Creation and Consulting, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC). (Burgess, C) Modified on 6/5/2019 (KWC)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian Blazer, filed by Davis Product Creation and Consulting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis Product Creation and Consulting, LLC v. Blazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Blazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davis Product Creation and Consulting, LLC
Represented By: C Gregory Burgess
Represented By: Jeremy A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?