Griffin v. Ed Syed Automotive LLC
Plaintiff: Samantha Griffin
Defendant: Ed Syed Automotive LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00963
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Samantha Griffin. Ed Syed Automotive LLC waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Donald, Thomas)
June 24, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3375790 (ALND B4601098601) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Ed Syed Automotive LLC, filed by Samantha Griffin.(KEK). (Donald, T) Modified on 6/25/2019 (KEK).
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ed Syed Automotive LLC, filed by Samantha Griffin.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Ed Syed Automotive LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Griffin
Represented By: T Christopher Donald
Represented By: Michael Parrish
Represented By: Thomas C. Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Syed Automotive LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?