Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Pallet Chief MFG et al
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Pallet Chief MFG and Barry Landers
Case Number: 1:2019cv01289
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Barry Landers served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (KEK)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Pallet Chief MFG served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (KEK)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Barry Landers, Pallet Chief MFG. Sent cia vertified mail. (KEK)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Richardson, Brian)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C Richardson on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Richardson, Brian)
August 15, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3412531 (ALND B4601099884) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Barry Landers, Pallet Chief MFG, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(KEK). (Richardson, Brian) Modified on 8/15/2019 (KEK).
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barry Landers, Pallet Chief MFG, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Pallet Chief MFG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pallet Chief MFG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Fredrick Lane Finch, Jr
Represented By: Brian C Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?