Stewart v. Wade et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Willard Stewart
Defendant: Mitchell Jones, Sheriff Deputy Stephen Garmon, Sheriff Matthew Wade and Judge Debra Jones
Case Number: 1:2019cv01291
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - The plaintiff is NOTIFIED that the court will not consider his request for release from custody in this action. If he seeks release from custody, he must file a separate habeas petition. Only the plaintiff's claims under 42 U.S.C. 1983and any appropriate relief thereunderwill be addressed in this action. With regard to any habeas petition the plaintiff may file, he is further NOTIFIED that federal courts will generally abstain from interfering in pending state criminal prosecutions except under extraordinary circumstances where the danger of irreparable loss is both great and immediate. Younger v. Harris, 401 U.S. 37 (1971). This abstention doctrine assures state courts an opportunity to consider claims before they will be considered by the federal courts. Further, before a petitioner may maintain a federal habeas petition, he must first exhaust all available state remedies. Georgalis v. Dixon, 776 F.2d 261 (11th Cir. 1985) (citing Walker v. Zant, 693 F.2d 1087 (11th Cir. 1982)). The doctrine of comity requires that the State of Alabama be afforded the opportunity to consider an alleged error before federal habeas corpus relief is available. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/30/2019. (AFS)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the court having received prisoner consent form the Warden is directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of Brandon Willard Stewart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/18/2019. (AFS)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 PRISONER CONSENT FORM filed by Brandon Willard Stewart. (KAM)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER terming motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is not required to pay a partial filing fee, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/5/2019. (AFS)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Certification of Prison or Jail Account by Matthew Wade. (AFS)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE (Request for Status) by Brandon Willard Stewart. Mailed docket sheet to Plaintiff first class mail. (AFS)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - It is ORDERED that Sheriff Matthew Wade, or the appropriate jail officer submit to this court within 15 days, information regarding the inmate account of the plaintiff Brandon Willard Stewart, for the last six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/26/2019. (AFS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT in Support #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by filed by Brandon Willard Stewart. (JLC)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING Plaintiff has 30 days from the entry of this order to file a new verified application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified copy of jail and or prison account statements for the last six months, in the event jail personnel refuse to certify the plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff should submit an affidavit stating to the court the name of the person to whom the plaintiff made the request, the date on which plaintiff made the request, and the exact response he received. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/15/2019. (AFS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brandon Willard Stewart. (AFS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights against Stephen Garmon, Debra Jones, Mitchell Jones, Matthew Wade, filed by Brandon Willard Stewart.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Wade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Deputy Stephen Garmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Matthew Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Debra Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Willard Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?