Stohs v. NewRez, LLC
Plaintiff: Matthew Stohs
Defendant: NewRez, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01308
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Brief in Support Thereof filed by NewRez, LLC. (Premo, Grant)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Brief in Support Thereof filed by Matthew Stohs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carroll, Matthew)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER setting briefing schedule for #5 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss is due on or before September 26, 2019. Any reply brief, if necessary, is due on or before October 3, 2019. All submissions should comply, as much as practicable, with the page limit and similar requirements found in Appendix II available on the courts website at www.alnd.uscourts.gov under the court information for Judge Bowdre. Although the court realizes "Appendix II" deals with summary judgment motions, many of the requirements are applicable to motions to dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 09/12/2019.(MCP)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Brief in Support Thereof by NewRez, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Premo, Grant)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Stohs. NewRez, LLC served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (JLC)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NewRez, LLC via certified U.S. Mail on this the 19th day of August, 2019. (JLC)
August 16, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, receipt number B4601099952. (JLC)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Matthew Stohs. (Carroll, Matthew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NewRez, LLC, filed by Matthew Stohs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stohs v. NewRez, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez, LLC
Represented By: Hallman B Eady
Represented By: Grant A Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Stohs
Represented By: Matthew F Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?