Liberty Insurance Corporation v. Shaw et al
Plaintiff: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc, US Bank Trust NA, HSBC Finance Corporation, Tina S. Shaw, Caliber Home Loans Inc and Arnold O. Shaw
Case Number: 1:2019cv01397
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HSBC Finance Corporation. filed by HSBC Finance Corporation (Leeth, Alan)
October 14, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HSBC Finance Corporation.(Leeth, Alan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. US Bank Trust NA served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (JLC)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Arnold O. Shaw.(Carpenter, Jonathan)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/19/2019. (SRD)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Caliber Home Loans Inc, US Bank Trust NA.(Anderson, Keith)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. HSBC Finance Corporation served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (KEK)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. Caliber Home Loans Inc. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019; Quicken Loans Inc. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (JLC)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. Arnold O. Shaw served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019; Tina S. Shaw served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (JLC)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants mailed certified mail. (KAM)
August 27, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3421567. related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(SRD). (Alvis, Stewart)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Alvis, Stewart)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Alvis, Stewart)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Insurance Corporation v. Shaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank Trust NA
Represented By: Keith S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Finance Corporation
Represented By: Alan D Leeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina S. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans Inc
Represented By: Keith S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold O. Shaw
Represented By: Jonathan Gabriel Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Joshua B Baker
Represented By: Joshua R Hess
Represented By: Stewart James Alvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?