LegacyTexas Bank v. Land and Natural Resource Development Inc
Plaintiff: LegacyTexas Bank
Defendant: Land and Natural Resource Development Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01420
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthias Kleinsasser filed by LegacyTexas Bank and #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Phillip Lamberson filed by LegacyTexas Bank. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/27/2019. (SRD)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthias Kleinsasser by LegacyTexas Bank. (Retherford, Jeremy)
September 26, 2019 PHV Fee paid for Matthias Kleinsasser in the amount of $75.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3442480, NDAL receipt #B46010011838. (Retherford, Jeremy) Modified on 9/26/2019 (JLC).
September 26, 2019 PHV Fee paid for Phillip Lamberson in the amount of $75.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3442468, NDAL receipt #B4601100837. (Retherford, Jeremy) Modified on 9/26/2019 (JLC).
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Phillip Lamberson by LegacyTexas Bank. (Retherford, Jeremy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LegacyTexas Bank. Land and Natural Resource Development Inc served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Retherford, Jeremy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Land and Natural Resource Development Inc., returned to Plaintiff for service on this the 4th day of September, 2019. (JLC)
September 4, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3426704 (ALND B4601100356) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Land and Natural Resource Development Inc filed by LegacyTexas Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (part 2), # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(SRD). (Retherford, Jeremy) Modified on 9/4/2019 (KEK).
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Land and Natural Resource Development Inc filed by LegacyTexas Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (part 1), #2 Exhibit A (part 2), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LegacyTexas Bank v. Land and Natural Resource Development Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LegacyTexas Bank
Represented By: Jeremy Lowery Retherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land and Natural Resource Development Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?