Davis v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: James G Davis
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Bank of New York Mellon, Trans Union LLC and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01496
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC.(Shaner, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Reid, Kirkland)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER: Defendant's #23 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant Bank of New York Mellon SHALL filed its responsive pleadings by December 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 10/30/2019. (SUH)
October 29, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Robinett, Matthew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 24 Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Young, L)
October 25, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Waiver of Service Executed, #1 Complaint, #22 Summons Returned Executed, 10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Motion is RIPE 10/25/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaner, John)
October 15, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James G Davis. Bank of New York Mellon served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (JLC)
October 9, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC. filed by Equifax Information Services LLC (Reid, Kirkland)
October 9, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3452605. (Shaner, John)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 10/08/2019. (SJB)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Trans Union LLC answer due 10/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 10/08/2019. (SJB)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amanda K. Blackmon Motion is RIPE 10/8/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Bank of New York Mellon, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Shaner, John)
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of New York Mellon. filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Shaner, John)
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC (Shaner, John)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John Houston Shaner on behalf of Bank of New York Mellon (Shaner, John)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC. filed by Trans Union LLC (Robinett, Matthew)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 10/8/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robinett, Matthew)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Answer now due by 11/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 10/07/2019. (SJB)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 10/4/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Reid, Kirkland)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Experian answer due 10/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 10/04/2019. (SJB)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions Inc. filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc (Young, L)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint Motion is RIPE 10/3/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Young, L)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James G Davis. Bank of New York Mellon waiver sent on 10/3/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Underwood, Earl)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC answer due 11/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 10/03/2019. (SJB)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 10/3/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaner, John)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James G Davis. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (JLC)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James G Davis. Experian Information Solutions Inc served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (KAM)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bank of New York Mellon, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Trans Union LLC. mailed certified mail (KAM)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of New York Mellon, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Trans Union LLC (Filing fee $ 400. fee paid 9/11/2019 rec# B4601100541), filed by James G Davis.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James G Davis
Represented By: Earl P Underwood, Jr
Represented By: Kenneth J Riemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?