McDonald v. Kilgore
Defendant: staff attorney 2
Petitioner: David Alonzo Ray McDonald
Respondent: Jimmy Kilgore
Case Number: 1:2019cv01958
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER notifying Petitioner that this case will be treated by the Court as ripe for summary disposition. Petitioner shall have twenty calendar (20) days from the date of this Order to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments he may wish to offer with regard to whether the petition is subject to summary disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/23/2019. (JLC)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Jimmy Kilgore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Poe, Beth)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Now pending before the court is the respondent's motion for an extension of time to comply with the show-cause order. (Doc. #6 ). The respondent's motion is granted to the extent the deadline to respond to the show-cause order is extended to January 17, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/3/2020. (KEK)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Jimmy Kilgore. (Poe, Beth)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Slate Poe on behalf of Jimmy Kilgore (Poe, Beth)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Respondent is ORDERED to appear and SHOW CAUSE in writing, within twenty (20) calendar days from the entry date of this order, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 12/6/2019. (KEK)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Petitioner has filed a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, which indicates he has a balance of $0.75 in his prisoner account at the Talladega County Jail. Accordingly, the undersigned finds that the motion to proceed in forma pauperis is due to be and hereby is GRANTED to the extent that Petitioner may proceed with this action without prepayment of the court filing fee or the giving of security therefor. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 12/6/2019. (KEK)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by David Alonzo Ray McDonald. (JLC)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by David Alonzo Ray McDonald.(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jimmy Kilgore
Represented By: Beth Slate Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Alonzo Ray McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: staff attorney 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?