Faughn v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Kathryn Faughn
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 1:2019cv02025
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn Faughn. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 12/30/2019, answer due 3/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Certified Receipts)(Pennington, John) Modified text on 1/3/2020 (MRR, ).
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, returned to pltf (in SASE) for service (MRR, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER- Pltf's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc #2 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 12/18/19. (MRR, )
December 18, 2019 NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the social security number of the plaintiff to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days from the entry date of this notice. The notice is to be given to the US Attorney outside of the electronic filing system (MRR, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 12/16/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Kathryn Faughn. (KEK)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Kathryn Faughn.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faughn v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Faughn
Represented By: John M Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?