McDonald v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: David Alonzo Ray McDonald
Defendant: Shea Brown, Butler and Jimmy Kilgore
Case Number: 1:2019cv02089
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Eastern Office
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER The plaintiff has submitted applications to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by certified copies of his jail and/or prison account statements. (Docs. #2 , #4 , #8 ). The applications are GRANTED. The undersigned ORDERS the plaintiff to sign and return to the Clerk of Court, within thirty (30) days of the entry date of this Order, the attached Prisoner Consent Form to signify that he wishes to continue with this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/14/2020. (SRD)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Alonzo Ray McDonald. (AKD)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #6 Notice of Deficient Pleading filed by David Alonzo Ray McDonald. (AKD)
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Waive Forma Pauperis is DENIED for the reasons stated within. If the plaintiff fails to correct the deficient pleading in compliance with this notice within 30 days from the entry date of this notice, the court may dismiss this case for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(SRD)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to waive in forma pauperis by David Alonzo Ray McDonald. (AKD)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Alonzo Ray McDonald. (KEK)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. If the plaintiff fails to correct the deficient pleading in compliance with this notice within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this notice, the court may dismiss this case for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(SRD)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Alonzo Ray McDonald. (KEK)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shea Brown, Butler, Jimmy Kilgore, filed by David Alonzo Ray McDonald.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shea Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Alonzo Ray McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?