Mueller et al v. Sylacauga Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Heather Mueller, Daniell Womack and Nicole Daniels
Defendant: Sylacauga Housing Authority
Case Number: 1:2020cv00029
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/3/20. (MRR, )
March 3, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (MRR, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Status Conference held on 3/2/2020; attys Jessica Wolinsky and Brandi Frederick present by telephone; conf adj. (chambers) (MSN)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is currently set for 10:00 a.m. on March 2, 2020, (Doc. #10 ). The parties are REMINDED that the status conference will be cancelled by separate order if, prior to the date of the conference, all parties submit forms indicating whether they consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/28/2020. (MSN)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/14/20. (MRR, )
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than March 30, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after March 30, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on March 2, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/14/20. (MRR, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sylacauga Housing Authority.(Frederick, Brandi)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The defendant's motion seeking an extension of time to answer the complaint is GRANTED. (Doc. #6 ). The defendant SHALL file an answer by February 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/7/20. (MRR, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sylacauga Housing Authority. filed by Sylacauga Housing Authority (Frederick, Brandi)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Returned Executed Motion is RIPE 2/6/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Sylacauga Housing Authority. (Frederick, Brandi)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard W Lewis on behalf of Sylacauga Housing Authority (Lewis, Richard)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Mueller, Nicole Daniels, Daniell Womack. Sylacauga Housing Authority served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020. (Wolinsky, Jessica)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sylacauga Housing Authority, returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
January 9, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601103231 (MRR, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sylacauga Housing Authority, filed by Heather Mueller, Nicole Daniels, Daniell Womack.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mueller et al v. Sylacauga Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Mueller
Represented By: Jessica Marie Wolinsky
Represented By: Anthony David Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniell Womack
Represented By: Jessica Marie Wolinsky
Represented By: Anthony David Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Daniels
Represented By: Jessica Marie Wolinsky
Represented By: Anthony David Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylacauga Housing Authority
Represented By: Richard W Lewis
Represented By: Brandi Branton Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?