Cook et al v. Deighan Law LLC et al
Plaintiff: Angela Cook and William Cook
Defendant: Law Solutions Chicago LLC, Upright Law LLC and Deighan Law LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00457
Filed: April 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 PHV Fee paid for David M. Menditto in the amount of $75.00, receipt number B4601106204. (JLC)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can Be Granted by Deighan Law LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(Morrison, Mariellen)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead (doc. #10 ). The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (doc. #1 ) is extended to May 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 5/22/2020. (SRD)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 8 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, by Deighan Law LLC, Law Solutions Chicago LLC, Upright Law LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morrison, Mariellen)
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deighan Law LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Menditto, David)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER GRANTING Defendants Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead (doc. #7 ). The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (doc. #1 ) is extended to May 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 5/14/2020. (SRD)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Deighan Law LLC, Law Solutions Chicago LLC, Upright Law LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morrison, Mariellen)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Mariellen Morrison on behalf of All Defendants (Morrison, Mariellen)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariellen Morrison on behalf of All Defendants (Morrison, Mariellen)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Cook, Angela Cook. Deighan Law LLC served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020 (green card not dated). (AKD)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Deighan Law LLC, Law Solutions Chicago LLC, Upright Law LLC mailed certified mail. (AKD)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Angela Cook, William Cook. (Ponder, J)
April 7, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601105167 (AKD)
April 3, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Deighan Law LLC, Law Solutions Chicago LLC, Upright Law LLC, filed by William Cook, Angela Cook.(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook et al v. Deighan Law LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Solutions Chicago LLC
Represented By: Mariellen Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upright Law LLC
Represented By: Mariellen Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deighan Law LLC
Represented By: David Michael Menditto
Represented By: Mariellen Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Cook
Represented By: Harry P Long
Represented By: J Bradley Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cook
Represented By: Harry P Long
Represented By: J Bradley Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?