Kings Creek Apparel LLC v. Wakefields Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kings Creek Apparel LLC
Defendant: Wakefields Inc, William M. Wakefield and Wakefields Inc doing business as Martins Family Clothing doing business as Wakefields Department Stores
Case Number: 1:2020cv00573
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kirby, Cason)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS- with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/23/20. (SAC)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 1:20-cv-573-ACA on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius. Magistrate Judge John E Ott no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff Kings Creek LLC's #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of E. Gary Beddingfield, Jr. is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 06/09/2020. (SUH)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Plaintiff Kings Creek LLC's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of E. Gary Beddingfield, Jr. Motion is RIPE 6/8/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Kings Creek Apparel LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Daley, Sarah)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3605776. (Daley, Sarah)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge on 7/6/2020 unless they unanimously consent to jurisdiction by the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 6/22/2020 11:00 AM before a magistrate judge; parties to call in as directed; if all parties submit an executed form 24 hours in advance, the telephone conference will be cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 5/22/2020. (BST)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER regarding compliance with Ruley 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/26/2020; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 5/22/2020. (BST, )
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by William M. Wakefield, Wakefields Inc.(Kirby, Cason)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kings Creek Apparel LLC as to William M. Wakefield. (green card returned unsigned, undated) (KAM)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kings Creek Apparel LLC. Wakefields Inc served on 5/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. (green card signed, not dated) (KAM)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3583205. (Daley, Sarah)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to William M. Wakefield, Wakefields Inc. mailed certified mail (KAM)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Presently pending is the #5 motion to allow Charles H. Rollins to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the plaintiff. (Doc. #4 ). The motion, which includes the information required under Local Rule 83.1(b), is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED, subject to the payment of the applicable fee within seven (7) calendar days. Upon receipt of the required fee, this conditional grant of pro hac vice status will become final without further court action.Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 05/01/2020. (SUH)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion is RIPE 4/30/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Kings Creek Apparel LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Daley, Sarah)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kings Creek Apparel LLC, filed by Kings Creek Apparel LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Daley, Sarah)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kings Creek Apparel LLC. filed by Kings Creek Apparel LLC (Daley, Sarah)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Kings Creek Apparel LLC. (Daley, Sarah)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William M. Wakefield, Wakefields Inc, filed by Kings Creek Apparel LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KAM)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3579463. related document #1 COMPLAINT against William M. Wakefield, Wakefields Inc, filed by Kings Creek Apparel LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(KAM). (Daley, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kings Creek Apparel LLC v. Wakefields Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefields Inc
Represented By: Andrew Phillip Campbell
Represented By: John Harrison Hagood
Represented By: Cason M Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Wakefield
Represented By: Andrew Phillip Campbell
Represented By: John Harrison Hagood
Represented By: Cason M Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefields Inc doing business as Martins Family Clothing doing business as Wakefields Department Stores
Represented By: Andrew Phillip Campbell
Represented By: John Harrison Hagood
Represented By: Cason M Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kings Creek Apparel LLC
Represented By: Charles Hackney Rollins
Represented By: Sarah Rose Daley
Represented By: Elwyn Gary Beddingfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?