Tavis v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Gary Tavis
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 1:2020cv00586
Filed: April 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 6/2/2020. (SRD)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston (Walters, Jason)
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Walters, Jason)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Tavis. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (JLC)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston mailed certified mail. (AKD)
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Gary Tavis. (Blocker, Ariel)
April 29, 2020 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3580923, NDAL receipt #B4601105635. (Blocker, Ariel) Modified on 4/29/2020 (JLC).
April 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, filed by Gary Tavis.(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tavis v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Jason A Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Tavis
Represented By: David P Martin
Represented By: Ariel S Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?