Bey v. Calhoun County et al
Plaintiff: Detrick Elston Bey
Defendant: Calhoun County Probation Office, Steven Walker, Matthew Wades, Randy Moeller, Calhoun County, Calhoun County Sheriff Dept, Jennifer Weems, Brian Howell, Daniel Oswalt, Stan Allen, Amber Wilson, Brian McVeigh and Tim Burgess
Case Number: 1:2020cv00955
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time. On or before September 24, 2020, the plaintiff shall file either an amended complaint or dismiss this action and initiate a habeas petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/25/2020. (SRD)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Order, by Detrick Elston Bey. (MEB2)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER The plaintiff is ADVISED that this court is required to screen civil rights complaints filed by prisoners against officers or employees of governmental entities and to dismiss the complaint or any portion thereof which is frivolous, malicious, fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or seeks monetary relief from a defendant who is immune from such relief. This mandatory screening cannot occur until the plaintiff clarifies the type of claim he attempts to state. The Clerk is DIRECTED to return the summons and complaints, contained in pre-addressed and postage paid envelopes, to the plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/17/2020. (SRD)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER The plaintiff is ORDERED to notify the court within 30 days of the date of this Order whether he wishes to: (1) continue with this action pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983; or (2) dismiss this action and file a habeas petition in which he corrects the deficiencies identified herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint Form, #2 Habeas Petition Form)(SRD)
July 20, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601107257. (KEK)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING The plaintiff failed to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee of $350.00 and administrative fee of $50.00. The plaintiff must either file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay a total of $400.00 ($350.00 filing fee + $50.00 administrative fee) to the Clerk of the Court within thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(SRD)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stan Allen, Tim Burgess, Calhoun County, Calhoun County Probation Office, Calhoun County Sheriff Dept, Brian Howell, Brian McVeigh, Randy Moeller, Daniel Oswalt, Matthew Wades, Steven Walker, Jennifer Weems, Amber Wilson, filed by Detrick Elston Bey.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey v. Calhoun County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calhoun County Probation Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Wades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Moeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calhoun County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calhoun County Sheriff Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Oswalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian McVeigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detrick Elston Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?