Green v. Oxford, City of et al
Plaintiff: Wren Green
Defendant: Oxford, City of and Mike Roberts
Case Number: 1:2020cv01281
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Defendants City of Oxford and Mike Roberts have moved to dismiss Plaintiff Wren Green's complaint. (Doc. #6 ). The court ordered Ms. Green to respond to the complaint on or before October 7, 2020. (Doc. #7 ). As of October 14, 2020, the court has not received a response from Ms. Green. Accordingly, the court ORDERS Ms. Green to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before October 23, 2020 why the court should not dismiss her case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/14/2020. (KEK)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Oxford, City of, Mike Roberts re #7 Order, Notice to Court Regarding Motion to Dismiss (Stubbs, Charles)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Defendants City of Oxford and Mike Roberts Motion to Dismiss - The Plaintiff's response to the motion is due on or before October 7, 2020. A reply, if any, is due on or before October 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/16/20. (SAC)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Oxford, City of, Mike Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Stubbs, Charles)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wren Green. Oxford, City of served (no date on green card); Mike Roberts served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (KEK)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Oxford, City of, Mike Roberts. Delivered to US Marshals for service. (KEK)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Before the court is Plaintiff Wren Green's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and for appointment of an attorney. (Doc. #2 ). The court finds that Mr. Green is indigent and therefore GRANTS the motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The court DIRECTS the Clerk to file this action without prepayment of a fee. However, the court DENIES the motion for appointment of counsel Appointment of counsel in civil litigation is not a right, but a privilege "justified only by exceptional circumstances, such as where the facts and legal issues are so novel or complex as to require the assistance of a trained practitioner." Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/31/2020. (KEK)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wren Green. (KEK)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oxford, City of, Mike Roberts, filed by Wren Green.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Oxford, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford, City of
Represented By: Charles David Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Roberts
Represented By: Charles David Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wren Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?