Curry v. United States of America
Petitioner: Spencer M Curry
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv08032
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Spencer M Curry. (MEB2)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SHOW CAUSE ORDER TO PETITIONER This is a motion to vacate, set aside, or correct a sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Petitioner Spencer M. Curry on July 28, 2020. #1 IT IS ORDERED that Wells show cause in writing within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order why this motion should not be dismissed with prejudice as untimely. See 28 U.S.C. 2255(f). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Curry fails to comply with this Order, this action may be dismissed without further proceedings. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 8/14/2020. (PSM)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) in 1:09-cr-58-LSC-JEO, filed by Spencer M Curry. (Deemed filed 7/28/2020) (SRD)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER As stated within, the undersigned DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to RECHARACTERIZE action 1:20-cv-1069-CLM-SGC as brought under 2255, reassign to the Chief U.S. District Judge Scott Coogler, who presided over the related criminal case, and file the motion in that action, 1:09-cr-00058-LSC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G. Cornelius on 8/13/2020.(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: William Gott Simpson
Represented By: Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Spencer M Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?