Hardy et al v. White et al
Plaintiff: Darren E Hardy and Marcus J Thompson
Defendant: Carrigan & Sons Trucking Inc, Jospeh Sanford White and Joseph Sanford White
Case Number: 1:2021cv00487
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery must be commenced in time to be completed by December 1, 2021. All potentially dispositive motions must be filed no later than December 10, 2021. The parties shall be ready for trial, to be scheduled by separate order, by April 4, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/20/2021. (KEK)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER; Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/19/2021. (BST, )
May 12, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (MRR, )
May 12, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hare, Lynn)
May 11, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Telephone Conference held on 5/11/2021. (BST, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE to remind parties of consent telephone conference scheduled for 11:00 AM on Tuesday, 5/11/2021; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, 24 hours in advance, the conference will be cancelled. (BST)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/27/2021; Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 4/22/2021. (BST, )
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than May 24, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after May 24, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby 11:00 a.m. on May 11, 2021. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 4/21/21. (MRR, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrigan & Sons Trucking Inc. filed by Carrigan & Sons Trucking Inc (Hare, Lynn)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jospeh Sanford White.(Hare, Lynn)
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Carrigan & Sons Trucking Inc.(Hare, Lynn)
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Calhouse County, case number 11-cv-2021-900093., filed by Jospeh Sanford White, Carrigan & Sons Trucking Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(MRR, )
April 7, 2021 COMPLAINT against Carrigan & Sons Trucking Inc, Jospeh Sanford White, filed by Marcus J Thompson, Darren E Hardy.-Deemed filed 3/16/21, Circuit Court of Calhoun County (Doc 1-1 p.4 of combined pdf)(MRR, )
April 7, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3814172 (B4601112527). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Calhouse County, case number 11-cv-2021-900093., filed by Jospeh Sanford White, Carrigan & Sons Trucking Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(MRR, ). (Hare, Lynn) Modified text on 4/7/2021 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy et al v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren E Hardy
Represented By: Michael K Beard
Represented By: Jane F Mauzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus J Thompson
Represented By: Michael K Beard
Represented By: Jane F Mauzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrigan & Sons Trucking Inc
Represented By: Lynn Etheridge Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jospeh Sanford White
Represented By: Lynn Etheridge Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Sanford White
Represented By: Lynn Etheridge Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?