Gaddis v. Bar Association, The
Plaintiff: Thomas Gaddis
Defendant: Bar Association, The, Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The and Jimmy Kilgore
Case Number: 1:2021cv00587
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 FINAL JUDGMENT in accordance with the memorandum and Rule 58 of FRCP, the claims presented in this matter are DISMISSED as unexhausted; a certificate of appealabilty is DENIED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/21/2021. (KAM)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/21/2021. (KAM)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Amended Petition) against Jimmy Kilgore, Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The, filed by Thomas Gaddis.(KAM)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - For the foregoing reasons, the undersigned RECOMMENDS the instant matter be DISMISSED for: (1) failing to assert claims cognizable, or seek relief available, in a federal habeas corpus action and/or for failing to exhaust state court remedies; and/or (2) under the three strikes provision of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Additionally, in accordance with Rule 11 of the Rules Governing 2254 Proceedings, the undersigned FURTHER RECOMMENDS a certificate of appealability be DENIED to the extent it may be required by Gaddis's invocation of 2254. Objections to R&R due by 6/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/26/2021. (KEK)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bar Association, The, filed by Thomas Gaddis.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaddis v. Bar Association, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bar Association, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gaddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?